Almeida v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff David Almeida alleges that Defendant Google Inc. failed to disclose that leaving the content ad CPC input blank would subject Plaintiff to charges for content ads on third party websites.

Plaintiff: David Almeida
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv02088
Filed: April 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2010 Filing 50 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2010 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 4/2/2010) re 39 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/2/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 49 JUDGMENT signed by Judge Whyte on 4/1/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 39 Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 47 CLERKS NOTICE - Submitting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on the Papers Without Oral Agrument. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 46 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)] filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 45 Reply Memorandum re 39 MOTION to Dismiss filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 44 Statement of Non-Opposition re 39 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS filed byDavid Almeida. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael V. Storti)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Storti, Michael) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 41 Motion to Relate Case (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 42 Declaration of Rebekah Punak in Support of 41 MOTION to Relate Case [NOTICE OF MOTION AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED] filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Punak, Rebekah) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 41 MOTION to Relate Case [NOTICE OF MOTION AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED] filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Silbert, David) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 40 Declaration of Christa Anderson in Support of 39 MOTION to Dismiss filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Anderson, Christa) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Silbert, David) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying without prejudice 27 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File a First Amended Complaint and to Set a New Case Management Conference. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
October 30, 2009 Filing 37 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2009 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 10/30/2009) re 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO SET NEW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO SET NEW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by David Almeida. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 36 Declaration of Michael V. Storti in Support of 35 Reply Memorandum, filed byDavid Almeida. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Storti, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 35 Reply Memorandum re 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO SET NEW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO SET NEW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed byDavid Almeida. (Storti, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER 33 to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/15/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 14, 2009 Filing 33 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Google, Inc.. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 32 Declaration of David J. Silbert in Support of 31 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint and to Set New Case Managmenet Conference filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to D)(Related document(s) 31 ) (Bertenthal, Alyse) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 31 Opposition to 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a 1st Amended Complaint and to Set a New Case Managmenet Conference filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Bertenthal, Alyse) (Filed on 10/9/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009 counsel failed to link entry to document #27 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER 29 to Vacate the Deadline for the Parties to Conduct Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/25/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 29 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO VACATE THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO CONDUCT MEDIATION by David Almeida. (Storti, Michael) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 28 Declaration of Michael V. Storti in Support of 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO SET NEW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO SET NEW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed byDavid Almeida. (Related document(s) 27 ) (Storti, Michael) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO SET NEW CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by David Almeida. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Storti, Michael) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 26 CLERKS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2009 10:30 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2009. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
May 20, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing rescheduled to 9/28/2009 at 09:30 AM at One Embarcadero Center, 18th Floor in San Francisco. Written statements due by 9/18/2009. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER 24 Modifying Case Schedule: Motion Hearing on Class Certification set for 10/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/2/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 6, 2009 Filing 24 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Modifying Case Schedule by Google, Inc.. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 4, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 5/28/2009 at 09:30 AM at the Mediator's San Francisco office located at One Embarcadero Center, 18th Floor. Written statements due by 5/15/2009. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER 14 : Motion Hearing on Motion for Class Certification set for 6/19/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/10/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 6, 2008 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 10/10/2008 at 10:00 a.m. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 22 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Robert Ebe as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 16 Defendant's Administrative Motion to Relate Case C08-3369 JW, C08-3452 RMW, and C08-3888 SI. It does not determine whether those cases are related to each other. That Issue is before Judge Ware, whose Levitte case has the lowest docket number of the three. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008) Modified on 10/16/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2008 Filing 19 Declaration of Willem F. Jonckheer in Support of 18 Memorandum in Opposition to Google's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed byDavid Almeida. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition to Google's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed byDavid Almeida. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 17 Declaration of Leo P. Norton in Support of 16 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 16 MOTION to Relate Cases C08-3369 JW, C08-3452 RMW, and C08-3888 SI filed by Google, Inc.. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified on 10/16/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2008 Filing 15 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/15/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 8/15/2008). Further Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2009 10:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/15/2008)
August 15, 2008 Filing 14 Proposed Order [Proposed] Scheduling and Case Management Order by Google, Inc.. (Bertenthal, Alyse) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 8, 2008 Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by David Almeida. (Torrijos, Alfredo) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER 11 Selecting ADR Process. Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/6/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
July 25, 2008 Filing 11 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by David Almeida (Torrijos, Alfredo) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 22, 2008 Pursuant to Related Case Order ( 10 ). Case reassigned to Magistrate Juddge Patricia V. Trumbull for all further discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASE to Case No. C-05-02885-RMW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/22/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
July 14, 2008 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint byGoogle, Inc.. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 06/30/08. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
June 30, 2008 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
June 27, 2008 Filing 6 Declaration of Alyse D. Bertenthal In Support of Defendant Google's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civ Local Rule 3-12 by Google, Inc. re 5 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Bertenthal, Alyse) (Filed on 6/27/2008) Text modified on 6/27/2008, incorrect event type used (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2008 Filing 5 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 by Google, Inc. (Bertenthal, Alyse) (Filed on 6/27/2008) Text modified on 6/27/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2008 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Google, Inc. (Bertenthal, Alyse) (Filed on 6/27/2008) Text modified on 6/30/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2008 ** DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY*** DOCKETED IN ERROR *** CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008) Modified on 4/23/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2008 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. (SUMMONS ISSUED); jury demand; ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611003015). Filed by avid Almeida. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2008: # 2 Complaint) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almeida v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Almeida
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?