Evanston Insurance Company v. Ghillie Suits.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: Ghillie Suits.Com, Inc., Todd Muirhead, Jeremy James Ehart, Kristy Ehart and Steven Ryan McClanahan
Case Number: 5:2008cv02099
Filed: April 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 79 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/16/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 66 Motion for Joinder; granting 72 Motion for Joinder (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONTINUING THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (approving doc. no. 53 ). The Case Management Conference set for 1/16/09 is CONTINUED to 2/6/09 immediately following the motion hearing. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/15/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 22 , 25 MOTIONS TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Ghillie Suits.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Bolender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghillie Suits.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Muirhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy James Ehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Ehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Ryan McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?