Welch et al v. City of San Jose
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Welch, Glen Bishop, Mitchell Witsinski and Robert Culbertson
Defendant: City of San Jose
Case Number: 5:2008cv02132
Filed: April 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION Judgment re: Settlement of FLSA Claim re 49 Stipulation. ***OSC Deadlines terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT OF FLSA CLAIM re 46 Stipulation. The 5/24/2010 status conference is vacated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT re 35 Case Management Statement. The Court finds good cause to VACATE the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently set for 8/31/2009. Status Conference re S ettlement set for 11/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. On or before 10/23/2009, the parties shall file a Joint Status Statement to update the Court on the progress of their settlement. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FROM 5/11/2009 TO 6/8/2009 re 26 Stipulation. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 5/29/2009. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 11/17/2008 to 12/1/2008. Joint Case Management Statement due 11/21/2008. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/13/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 9/8/2008 to 10/20/2008 re 11 Stipulation filed by City of San Jose. Joint Case Management Conference statement/Rule 26(f) disclosures due 10/10/2008. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/4/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch et al v. City of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Welch
Represented By: Christopher Eugene Platten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Bishop
Represented By: Christopher Eugene Platten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Witsinski
Represented By: Christopher Eugene Platten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Culbertson
Represented By: Christopher Eugene Platten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?