Trachsel et al v Ronald Bushholz, et al
Plaintiff: Steve Trachsel, Sun City Towers, LLC, Thomas Cirrito, Atocha Land, LLC, Michael Cirrito and Cirriro Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Ronald Buchholz, RDB Development LLC, Solomon Capital LLC, Jonathan Vento, Grace Capital, LLC, Donald Zeleznak, Z-Loft, LLC, Zeleznak Property Management LLC, Keller Williams Realty, Inc. and Charice Fischer
Case Number: 5:2008cv02248
Filed: April 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 JUDGMENT signed by Judge Whyte on 2/22/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Whyte on 1/28/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Dismissing Certain Plaintiffs: Sun City Towers, LLC, Atocha Land, LLC and Cirriro Holdings, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/8/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/20/2009 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/22/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 153 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jesshill E. Love and Todd Andrew Roberts terminated (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 24 Application for Right to Attach Order. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Granting Request to File Supplemental Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Whyte on 03/01/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER 136 to Extend Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/12/09. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER re 131 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Whyte on 1/26/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 103 Buccholz defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER 121 Re: Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for a Right to Attach Order: Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/17/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER 101 Selecting ADR Process. Mediation Selected. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 91 application for order compelling compliance with August 8, 2008 order.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 AMENDED ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/22/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER vacating hearing date. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/22/08. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 16 17 63 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 78 Grace Defendants' Request for Leave to File a Late Reply (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trachsel et al v Ronald Bushholz, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Trachsel
Represented By: Todd Andrew Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun City Towers, LLC
Represented By: Todd Andrew Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Cirrito
Represented By: Todd Andrew Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atocha Land, LLC
Represented By: Todd Andrew Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cirrito
Represented By: Todd Andrew Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirriro Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Todd Andrew Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDB Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Vento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Zeleznak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Loft, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeleznak Property Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charice Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?