Fernandez v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Max Fernandez
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Case Number: 5:2008cv02266
Filed: May 1, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER 21 Awarding Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER setting briefing schedule re 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA, Signed by Judge Whyte on 4/28/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER 14 of Remand; and JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/25/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER 12 for Defendant's Second Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Fernandez
Represented By: Terry LaPorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?