Baxter v. Credit Consulting Sevices, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Baxter
Defendant: Credit Consulting Sevices, Inc. and Herendeen & Bryan
Case Number: 5:2008cv02532
Filed: May 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 26 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/7/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Telephonic Appearance by Defendant's Insurance Representative at Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 12/16/08. (wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/12/08 is CONTINUED to 1/9/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/5/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/9/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING 15 REQUEST TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/3/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter v. Credit Consulting Sevices, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Baxter
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Consulting Sevices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herendeen & Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?