Johnson v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Tina L Johnson
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2008cv02558
Filed: May 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: No cause code entered

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 for the Payment of Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Judge Whyte on 05/17/2011. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Whyte on 03/30/2011. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER 8 Vacating the 1/29/2010 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/27/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina L Johnson
Represented By: Marc V. Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Sharla Cerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?