Decarta, Inc. v. Geosentric OYJ
Plaintiff: Decarta, Inc.
Defendant: Geosentric OYJ
Case Number: 5:2008cv02620
Filed: May 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 34 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/10/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 Stipulation filed by Decarta, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/24/08. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 Stipulation filed by Decarta, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/27/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 Stipulation filed by Decarta, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/2/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Decarta, Inc. v. Geosentric OYJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Decarta, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Michael Faigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geosentric OYJ
Represented By: Otto F. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?