Kassa et al v. BP West Coast Products, LLC
Plaintiff: Omer Kassa and H&O, Inc.
Defendant: BP West Coast Products, LLC
Case Number: 5:2008cv02725
Filed: May 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Franchise Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:2801 Petroleum Marketing Practices Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER 95 , 96 for Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/27/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 70 Motion for Discovery; granting 82 and 83 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying 85 Motion to Continue Trial Date (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER 78 Continuing Summary Judgment Motions and Motion to Reopen Non-Expert Discovery, and Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default Hearing Dates and Other Related Filing Dates. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/22/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER 64 Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney, Attorney George Holland, Sr terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/23/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER 62 Continuing Trial and All Dates Attendant Thereto: Jury Trial set for 4/19/2010 01:30 PM. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 52 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; ordering plaintiff to produce documents and pay remaining monetary sanctions by September 8, 2009. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER 56 Continuing Trial and All Dates Attendant Thereto: Jury Trial set for 2/22/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Discovery cutoff 10/16/2009. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/12/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER 39 to Continue Deadline for Initial Exchange of Expert Witness Reports and Designation of Rebuttal Witnesses. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/20/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ** E-FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOCKET NO. 42 ** STIPULATION AND ORDER 39 to Continue Deadline for Initial Exchange of Expert Witness Reports and Designation of Rebuttal Witnesses. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/20/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009) Modified on 4/23/2009 (jg, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kassa et al v. BP West Coast Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omer Kassa
Represented By: George Holland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&O, Inc.
Represented By: George Holland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products, LLC
Represented By: Kurt Vandercook Osenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?