Autodesk, Inc. v. Taney Engineering, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Autodesk, Inc.
Defendant: Taney Engineering, Inc. and Taney Cunningham Equipment, LLC
Case Number: 5:2008cv03132
Filed: June 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Copyright Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:501 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 32 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/3/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING 28 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/12/08 is CONTINUED to 3/13/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/8/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING 23 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/24/08 is CONTINUED to 12/12/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/6/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autodesk, Inc. v. Taney Engineering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autodesk, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Kevin Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taney Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taney Cunningham Equipment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?