Abbate v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard T Abbate
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2008cv03451
Filed: July 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissing of Action with Prejudice as to all Defendants re 48 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement re 45 Notice of Settlement. Show Cause Response or Stipulated Dismissal due by 8/17/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - (JURY TRIAL): Joint Pretrial Conference Statement, In Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions Due 12/14/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2010 11:00 AM, Jury Selection set for 1/26/2010 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 1/26/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOUND AS MOOT re 36 Stipulation, filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Defendants have complied with the February 13, 2009 deadline. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/20/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint re 34 Stipulation. Deadline to respond due 2/9/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING DEADLINE FOR REFERRAL TO THE COURTS ADR PROGRAM. In light of the Court's October 21, 2008 Order (Docket Item No. 21) adopting the parties' Stipulation regarding the ADR process, the Court VACATES its deadline for the parties to contact the ADR program. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/24/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbate v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard T Abbate
Represented By: Douglas B. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Mario Forni, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?