Facebook, Inc. v. Studivz, Ltd et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Facebook, Inc. alleged that Defendants StudiVZ Ltd. ran a knockoff of Facebook\'s website by copying the look, feel, features and services of facebook.com

Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Studivz, Ltd, Verlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH and Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH
Case Number: 5:2008cv03468
Filed: July 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 186 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 186 STIPULATION Request for Dismissal with Prejudice by Facebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 185 Declaration in Support of 184 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,,,,,,,, [Dr. of Dr. Siegfried H. Elsing] filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B Part 2)(Related document(s) 184 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 184 Memorandum in Opposition re 180 MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 18, 2009 Filing 183 CLERKS NOTICE re Motion Hearing. Motion hearings re 159 defendants' motion for protective order and 163 plaintiff's motion to compel, set for 6/19/2009, have been VACATED. Matters are deemed submitted without oral argument. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 182 Proposed Order re 180 MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND by Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH, Studivz, Ltd. (Walker, William) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 181 Declaration of William M. Walker in Support of 180 MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOT MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH, Studivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 180 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 180 MOTION to Stay re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 ., 163 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Facebook's Second Round of Discovery to Defendants, MOTION Requesting Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 ., 163 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Facebook's Second Round of Discovery to Defendants filed by Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH, Studivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw)(Walker, William) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER GRANTING 170 MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/15/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 11, 2009 Filing 178 Reply Memorandum re 163 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Facebook's Second Round of Discovery to Defendants Facebook's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses re: Second Round of Discovery Requests filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 177 Reply Memorandum re 159 MOTION to Quash Motion for Protective Order Quashing Facebooks Subpoenas Served on Third Parties filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH, Studivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 2 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 3 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 4 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 5 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw)(Walker, William) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 176 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 175 Memorandum in Opposition, 174 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH, Studivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 175 , 174 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 175 Memorandum in Opposition re 163 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Facebook's Second Round of Discovery to Defendants filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 2 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw)(Walker, William) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 174 Memorandum in Opposition re 163 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Facebook's Second Round of Discovery to Defendants filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 2 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 3 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 4 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 5 Appendix Opinion only Available on Lexis or Westlaw)(Walker, William) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 8, 2009 Filing 173 Memorandum in Opposition re 170 MOTION to Continue July 10, 2009 Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 8, 2009 Filing 172 Memorandum in Opposition re 170 MOTION to Continue July 10, 2009 Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Walker, William) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 171 Declaration in Support of 170 MOTION to Continue July 10, 2009 Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 170 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 170 MOTION to Continue July 10, 2009 Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 165 plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time. Plaintiff's opposition to motion to quash due by 6/2/2009. Defendant's reply on motion to quash due by 6/9/2009. Defendants' opposition to motion to compel due by 6/9/2009. Plaintiff's reply on motion to compel due by 6/11/2009. Defendants' motion to quash and plaintiff's motion to compel to be heard on 6/19/2009, 2:00 PM. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 168 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 167 Memorandum in Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 167 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 167 Memorandum in Opposition re 165 MOTION to Shorten Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 166 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 165 MOTION to Shorten Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 165 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 165 MOTION to Shorten Time Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-3 filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 164 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 163 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Facebook's Second Round of Discovery to Defendants filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 163 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 163 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Facebook's Second Round of Discovery to Defendants filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 162 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 161 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 161 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 Filing 161 Memorandum in Opposition re 159 MOTION to Quash Motion for Protective Order Quashing Facebooks Subpoenas Served on Third Parties Facebook's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoenas filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 19, 2009 Filing 160 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 159 MOTION to Quash Motion for Protective Order Quashing Facebooks Subpoenas Served on Third Parties filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, part 2)(Related document(s) 159 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 19, 2009 Filing 159 MOTION to Quash Motion for Protective Order Quashing Facebooks Subpoenas Served on Third Parties filed by Studivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Walker, William) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 158 Letter from Thomas Gray to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd regarding Order issued Monday, May 4, 2009 by United States District Judge Fogel. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 157 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/01/2009, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2009. (Clanton, Summer) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DEFERRING RULING ON 41 & 42 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing re-set for 7/10/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/4/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 156 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 5/1/2009) re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens. The motions are taken under submission. The case management conference is not held. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2009)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS TO MAY 1, 2009 (approving 144 ). The Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2009 is CONTINUED to 5/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/10/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 153 Declaration of Karsten Butzke in Support of 150 Brief, StudiVZ's Motion to Dismiss Re Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Related document(s) 150 ) (Smith, Stephen) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 152 Declaration of Dr. Anton G. Maurer in Support of 150 Brief, StudiVZ's Supplemental Replies In Support of Motions to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Related document(s) 150 ) (Smith, Stephen) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 151 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 152 . *** Declaration of Dr. Anton G. Maurer in Support of 150 Brief, StudiVZ's Supplemental Replies in Support of Motions to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Related document(s) 150 ) (Smith, Stephen) (Filed on 4/10/2009) Modified on 4/10/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2009 Filing 150 Brief re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens -- Supplemental Reply In Support of StudiVZ Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Smith, Stephen) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 149 Brief re 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens -- Supplemental Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Related document(s) 41 ) (Smith, Stephen) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 148 Declaration of Mark Howitson in Support of 145 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 145 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 147 Declaration of Dr. Katharina Scheja in Support of 145 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 145 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 146 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 145 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 145 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 76 Memorandum in Opposition, Supplemental Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 76 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 144 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens to May 1, 2009 by Facebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 143 Summons Issued as to Dennis Bemmann and Michael Brehm. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 142 AMENDED COMPLAINT re Docket No. 140, EXHIBITS 26 THROUGH 33 TO AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27, # 2 Exhibit 28, # 3 Exhibit 29, # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibit 31, # 6 Exhibit 32, # 7 Exhibit 33)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 141 AMENDED COMPLAINT re Docket No. 140, EXHIBITS 14 THROUGH 25 TO AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 19, # 6 Exhibit 20, # 7 Exhibit 21, # 8 Exhibit 22, # 9 Exhibit 23, # 10 Exhibit 24, # 11 Exhibit 25)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 140 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 139 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2009 is continued to 4/17/2009 09:00 AM, to be heard with the motion. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 30, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2009 09:00 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER RE 119 & 122 MOTIONS FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/30/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 137 OBJECTIONS to re 131 Declaration in Support by Studivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 136 Declaration of Martin Weber in Support of 133 Reply Memorandum,,,, 132 Reply Memorandum,, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 133 , 132 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 135 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 133 Reply Memorandum,,,, 132 Reply Memorandum,, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 133 , 132 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 134 Declaration of William M. Walker in Support of 133 Reply Memorandum,,,, 132 Reply Memorandum,, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 3 Appendix Exhibit I, # 4 Appendix Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 133 , 132 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 133 Reply Memorandum re 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix German Opinion, part 1 of 2, # 2 Appendix German Opinion, part 2 of 2, # 3 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 4 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 5 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 6 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 7 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 8 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 9 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 10 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 11 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 12 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 13 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw)(Walker, William) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 132 Reply Memorandum re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix German Opinion, part 1 of 2, # 2 Affidavit German Opinion, part 2 of 2, # 3 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 4 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw, # 5 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis or Westlaw)(Walker, William) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 131 Declaration of Annette L. Hurst in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 130 Declaration of Dr. Anton G. Maurer in Support of 128 Memorandum in Opposition filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page)(Related document(s) 128 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 129 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 128 Memorandum in Opposition filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Related document(s) 128 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 128 Memorandum in Opposition re 122 MOTION to Stay Facebook's L.R. 6-3 Motion to Stay Hearing (Partial Opposition) filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 127 Memorandum in Opposition re 122 MOTION to Stay Facebook's L.R. 6-3 Motion to Stay Hearing filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 126 Declaration of Katharina Scheja in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 125 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition,, Facebook's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 124 Memorandum in Opposition re 119 MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Staying the Personal Jurisdiction Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss Pending the Outcome of the Forum Non Conveniens Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jur MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Staying the Personal Jurisdiction Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss Pending the Outcome of the Forum Non Conveniens Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jur filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 123 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 122 MOTION to Stay Facebook's L.R. 6-3 Motion to Stay Hearing filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 122 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 122 MOTION to Stay Facebook's L.R. 6-3 Motion to Stay Hearing filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 121 ERRATA re 119 MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Staying the Personal Jurisdiction Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss Pending the Outcome of the Forum Non Conveniens Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jur MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Staying the Personal Jurisdiction Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss Pending the Outcome of the Forum Non Conveniens Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jur Notice of Errata by Studivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Walker, William) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 120 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 119 MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Staying the Personal Jurisdiction Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss Pending the Outcome of the Forum Non Conveniens Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jur MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Staying the Personal Jurisdiction Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss Pending the Outcome of the Forum Non Conveniens Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jur filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 119 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 19, 2009 Filing 119 MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Staying the Personal Jurisdiction Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss Pending the Outcome of the Forum Non Conveniens Portion of StudiVZs Motion to Dismiss re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Studivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walker, William) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 118 Letter from Thomas J. Gray. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 12, 2009 Filing 117 Letter from Stephen S. Smith. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SECOND INTERIM ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's response to defendants' 3/12/2009 letter due by 3/16/2009, 5:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/12/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 115 Reply to Opposition re 104 MOTION to Strike 97 Declaration in Support,,, [Facebook's Reply ISO Motion to Strike Smith Declaration] filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 INTERIM ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendant's letter due by 3/12/2009, 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/6/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 114 Letter from Stephen S. Smith. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 113 Letter from Thomas Gray. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 3, 2009 Filing 111 Memorandum in Opposition re 104 MOTION to Strike 97 Declaration in Support,,, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 3, 2009 Filing 110 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2009 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 3/3/2009) re 91 83 , 86 (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 109 OBJECTIONS to re 90 Declaration in Support,, Evidentiary Objections to January 27, 2009 Declaration of Avalos (Docket No. 90) by Studivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 108 Reply Memorandum re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 107 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 106 Reply Memorandum filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 106 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 106 Reply Memorandum re 86 MOTION for Sanctions Against StudiVZ LTD., Holtzbrinck Ventures GMBH and Holtzbrinck Networks GMBH Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1 and 37-2 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 105 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 104 MOTION to Strike 97 Declaration in Support,,, filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 104 MOTION to Strike 97 Declaration in Support,,, filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 103 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 102 Reply Memorandum, for Sanctions due to Facebook's Cancellation of Depositions filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 102 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 102 Reply Memorandum re 83 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Its Counsel due to Facebook's Cancellation of Depositions After Defense Counsel Had Already Flown to Germany filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 101 Declaration of Thomas J. Gray in Support of 99 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 99 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 100 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 99 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 99 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 99 Memorandum in Opposition re 83 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Its Counsel due to Facebook's Cancellation of Depositions After Defense Counsel Had Already Flown to Germany filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 98 Declaration of William M. Walker in Support of 96 Memorandum in Opposition, 95 Memorandum in Opposition,, 94 Memorandum in Opposition,,, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Related document(s) 96 , 95 , 94 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 97 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 95 Memorandum in Opposition,, 94 Memorandum in Opposition,,, 96 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) 95 , 94 , 96 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 96 Memorandum in Opposition re 86 MOTION for Sanctions Against StudiVZ LTD., Holtzbrinck Ventures GMBH and Holtzbrinck Networks GMBH Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1 and 37-2 filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database, # 2 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database)(Walker, William) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 95 Memorandum in Opposition re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database)(Walker, William) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 10, 2009 Filing 94 Memorandum in Opposition re 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database, # 2 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database, # 3 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database, # 4 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database, # 5 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database, # 6 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database, # 7 Appendix Opinion only available on Online Database)(Walker, William) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 93 CLERKS NOTICE The Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2009 is CONTINUED to 4/10/2009 at 9:00 AM. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 77 MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 91 MOTION to Compel COMPLETE INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM STUDIVZ LTD., HOLTZBRINCK VENTURES GMBH AND HOLTZBRINCK NETWORKS GMBH PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 7-1 AND 37-2 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 88 . filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 90 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 88 MOTION to Compel Complete Interrogatory Responses and Documetn Production from StudiVZ LTD, Holtzbrinck Venture GMBH and Holtzbrinck Networks filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 89 Declaration of Thomas J. Gray in Support of 88 MOTION to Compel Complete Interrogatory Responses and Documetn Production from StudiVZ LTD, Holtzbrinck Venture GMBH and Holtzbrinck Networks filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 88 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 88 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 91 . *** MOTION to Compel Complete Interrogatory Responses and Documetn Production from StudiVZ LTD, Holtzbrinck Venture GMBH and Holtzbrinck Networks filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/27/2009) Modified on 1/28/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2009 Filing 87 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 86 MOTION for Sanctions Against StudiVZ LTD., Holtzbrinck Ventures GMBH and Holtzbrinck Networks GMBH Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1 and 37-2 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 86 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 86 MOTION for Sanctions Against StudiVZ LTD., Holtzbrinck Ventures GMBH and Holtzbrinck Networks GMBH Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1 and 37-2 filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 85 Declaration of William M. Walker in Support of 83 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Its Counsel due to Facebook's Cancellation of Depositions After Defense Counsel Had Already Flown to Germany filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Related document(s) 83 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 84 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 83 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Its Counsel due to Facebook's Cancellation of Depositions After Defense Counsel Had Already Flown to Germany filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 83 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 83 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Its Counsel due to Facebook's Cancellation of Depositions After Defense Counsel Had Already Flown to Germany filed by Studivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walker, William) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 82 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 81 Memorandum in Opposition,, 80 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 81 , 80 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 81 Memorandum in Opposition re 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternat MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternat filed byStudivz, Ltd. (Walker, William) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 80 Memorandum in Opposition re 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternat MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternat filed byHoltzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 79 Declaration of Thomas J. Gray in Support of 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternat MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternat filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 77 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 78 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternat MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternat filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 77 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 76 Memorandum in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 71 . filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 17, 2009 Filing 75 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 71 Memorandum in Opposition, [Supplemental Declaration] in Support of Facebook's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 71 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/17/2009)
January 17, 2009 Filing 74 Declaration of Thomas J. Gray in Support of 71 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Enlarge Time filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 71 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/17/2009)
January 17, 2009 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Clemens Mayer-Wegelin in Opposition to 71 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction et al. filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 71 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/17/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Julio C. Avalos in Opposition to 71 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction et al. filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 71 ) (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 71 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 76 . *** Memorandum in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 1/16/2009) Modified on 1/22/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2008 Filing 70 Declaration of William M. Walker in Support of 69 Brief, 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 69 , 42 , 41 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 69 Brief re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Related document(s) 42 , 41 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 51 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 67 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2008 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 12/16/2008) re 51 (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2008)
December 2, 2008 Filing 66 OBJECTIONS to re 58 Declaration in Support, 60 Declaration in Support, (Evidentiary Objections to Declarations of Scheja and Parker) by Studivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
December 2, 2008 Filing 65 Declaration of Dr. Anton G. Maurer in Support of 63 Reply Memorandum,,,, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit O, part 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit O, part 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit O, part 3 of 3)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
December 2, 2008 Filing 64 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 63 Reply Memorandum,,,, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
December 2, 2008 Filing 63 Reply Memorandum re 51 MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis, # 2 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis, # 3 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis, # 4 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis, # 5 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis, # 6 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis)(Walker, William) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 62 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing re 51 set for 12/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 61 STIPULATION FOR [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Stipulated)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 60 Declaration of Warrington S. Parker in Support of 59 Memorandum in Opposition,,, to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 59 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 57 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 51 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 58 Declaration of Katharina Scheja in Support of 57 Memorandum in Opposition,,, to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 57 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 57 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 59 . *** Memorandum in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 11/18/2008) Modified on 11/20/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2008 Filing 56 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/07/2008, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2009. (Clanton, Summer) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 55 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2008 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 11/7/2008). The Court adopts the proposed case schedule. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2009 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 11/30/2009 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2009 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2008)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION re 48 Deadlines for Plaintiff's Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens and Defendants' Reply Papers Thereto. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/29/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 Selecting Private Mediation, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/20/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 52 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 51 MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 51 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 51 MOTION for Protective Order (1) Staying Discovery Not Related to Disputed Material Issues Raised in Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Forum Non Conveniens and (2) Preventing Discovery Produced in This Action From Being Used in Foreign Courts filed by Studivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walker, William) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 50 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Joint). (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 48 STIPULATION RE DEADLINES FOR PLTFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' 42 MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS AND DEFENDANTS' REPLY PAPERS THERETO by Studivz, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Stephen) (Filed on 10/28/2008) Modified on 10/29/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2008 Filing 47 Declaration of Michael Brehm in Support of 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 42 , 41 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 46 Declaration of Martin Weber in Support of 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 42 , 41 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 45 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 42 , 41 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 44 Declaration of Klaus Ikas (signature page) in Support of 43 Declaration in Support,, filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Related document(s) 43 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 43 Declaration of Klaus Ikas in Support of 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens, 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 42 , 41 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Studivz, Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis, # 2 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis, # 3 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis, # 4 Proposed Order)(Walker, William) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Case Only Available on Lexis, # 2 Proposed Order)(Walker, William) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendants and their counsel (Walker, William) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 38 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private Mediation by Facebook, Inc. (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 11/3/2008 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Document. Court to hold documents submitted for sealing for three court days from date of this order. If plaintiff intends to retrieve its documents, it should notify this court's chambers in advance. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 36 Notice of Withdrawal of 11 Motion for Expedited Discovery re: Personal Jurisdiction filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified on 10/14/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2008 Filing 35 Memorandum in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Seal Document filed byStudivz, Ltd, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Walker, William) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 2, 2008 Filing 34 NOTICE by Verlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH Withdrawal of Mtn to Dismiss of Verlagsgruppe for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Walker, William) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
September 30, 2008 Received Exhibit I (FILED UNDER SEAL). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Received Declaration (FILED UNDER SEAL). (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 32 Declaration in Support, re Avalos Decl and Ex. I (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 32 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 29 Reply to Opposition filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 31 Declaration in Support of 30 MOTION to Seal Document filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 30 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 29 Reply to Opposition re 11 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) re: Personal Jurisdiction filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 28 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 24 MOTION Administrative Relief to Set Status Conference WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 27 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE RE: VERLAGSGRUPPE GEORG VON HOLTZBRINCK, GMBH by Facebook, Inc.. (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 26 Proposed Order re 24 MOTION Administrative Relief to Set Status Conference by Facebook, Inc.. (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 25 Declaration of Warrington S. Parker in Support of 24 MOTION Administrative Relief to Set Status Conference filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 25, 2008 Filing 24 MOTION Administrative Relief to Set Status Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Parker, Warrington) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 23 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery filed byStudivz, Ltd, Verlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition re 11 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) re: Personal Jurisdiction filed byStudivz, Ltd, Verlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Facebook's Motion for Expedited Discovery, # 2 Appendix Case Only Available on Lexis, # 3 Appendix Case Only Available on Lexis, # 4 Appendix Case Only Available on Lexis, # 5 Appendix Case Only Available on Lexis)(Walker, William) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 18, 2008 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 2 ADR Scheduling Order, Case Referred to ECF, 3 Summons Issued, 7 Certificate of Interested Entities, 1 Complaint (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Shortening Time. Plaintiff's "Motion for Expedited Discovery re Personal Jurisdiction" (Docket #11) set for hearing 10/14/2008, 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2. Briefing to proceed in accordance with 35-day calendar under Civil Local Rules. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 19 Declaration of William M. Walker in Support of 17 Memorandum in Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time filed byVerlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 18 Declaration of Stephen S. Smith in Support of 17 Memorandum in Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time filed byVerlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byVerlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Opinion only available on Lexis)(Walker, William) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 16 Declaration of Dr. Jochen Gutbrod in Support of 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byVerlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 15 ) (Walker, William) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 10, 2008 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Verlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walker, William) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 13 MOTION to Shorten Time, 12 Declaration in Support, 11 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) re: Personal Jurisdiction (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 13 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 12 Declaration of Julio C. Avalos in Support of 11 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) re: Personal Jurisdiction filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 11 ) (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 11 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) re: Personal Jurisdiction filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
August 26, 2008 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 8 Waiver of Service Executed, (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Facebook, Inc. as to Studivz, Ltd, Verlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Facebook, Inc.. Service waived by Studivz, Ltd waiver sent on 8/25/2008, answer due 11/24/2008; Verlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH waiver sent on 8/25/2008, answer due 11/24/2008; Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH waiver sent on 8/25/2008, answer due 11/24/2008; Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH waiver sent on 8/25/2008, answer due 11/24/2008. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
July 24, 2008 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 7/24/2008)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 07/23/08. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
July 22, 2008 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Facebook, Inc. (Chatterjee, I.) (Filed on 7/21/2008) Text modified on 7/22/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Studivz, Ltd, Verlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH, Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH, Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2008. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2008 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611003553). Filed by Facebook, Inc. (OVER SIZED DOCUMENT (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2008) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. Studivz, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Evan Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Studivz, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verlagsgruppe George Von Holtzbrinck GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Networks GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Ventures GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?