Lona v. Abreu
Appellant: Corrina Curiel Lona
Appellee: Jose Abreu
Trustee: John W. Richardson and Office of the U.S. Trustee/SJ
Miscellaneous: Roger L. Efremsky and USBC Manager-San Jose
Case Number: 5:2008cv03563
Filed: July 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Bankruptcy Appeal (801) Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 19 APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/12/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lona v. Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Corrina Curiel Lona
Represented By: Judith L. Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jose Abreu
Represented By: Stevan C. Adleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John W. Richardson
Represented By: Charles P. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee/SJ
Represented By: Nanette Dumas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Roger L. Efremsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?