Digital Background Corporation v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Digital Background Corporation alleged that Defendant Apple Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 5,764,306 entitled "Real-Time Method of Digitally Altering a Video Data Stream to Remove Portions of the Original Image and Substitute Elements to Create a New Image." Defendant Apple Inc. counterclaimed and requested declaratory judgment that the '306 patent claims are invalid, unenforceable and not infringed.

Plaintiff: Digital Background Corporation
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Apple, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Digital Background Corporation
Case Number: 5:2008cv03639
Filed: July 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 39 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/5/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 39
Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice by Digital Background Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order)(Howard, Crystal) (Filed on 8/4/2008) Text modified on 8/4/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2008 Filing 37
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:07-cv-00803. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 36, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 30, 2008 Filing 38
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2008. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2008 02:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
March 18, 2008 Filing 35
Letter to Northern District of California re case transfer (dka, )
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Northern District of California. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/17/08. (dka, )
March 4, 2008 Filing 31
REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina M. Finn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Certificate of Service)(Valentine, James)
February 25, 2008 Filing 30
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Digital Background Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Apple Reports Fourth Quarter Results, # 2 Exhibit B - Westlaw - Apple Computer, Inc. v. Unova, Inc.; D.Del, 2003, # 3 Exhibit C - Excerpt, Apple, Inc.'s Form 10-K Filed with SEC, # 4 Exhibit D - List of Authorized Apple Resellers within Zip Code 62201)(Lesko, Paul)
February 14, 2008 Filing 28
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Count III, or in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Counterclaim Count III of Defendant Apple, Inc. by Digital Background Corporation. Responses due by 3/18/2008 (Lesko, Paul)
February 13, 2008 Filing 27
NOTICE of Appearance by Ted N. Gianaris on behalf of Digital Background Corporation (Gianaris, Ted)
February 6, 2008 Filing 25
MOTION to Transfer Case by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bruce Arthur, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of James F. Valentine, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Certificate of Service)(Valentine, James)
January 22, 2008 Filing 24
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Background Corporation by Apple, Inc..(Conran, Joseph)
January 18, 2008 Filing 23
NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 2/19/2008 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Court House before Mag/Judge Clifford J. Proud. (amv)
January 17, 2008 Filing 22
CJRA TRACK B assigned:Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2009 at 09:30 AM in Benton Court House before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.,Jury Trial set for 1/20/2009 at 09:00 AM in Benton Court House before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. (by:kjr)
January 16, 2008 Filing 21
Motion and Order to Appear Pro Hac Vice granting appearance of Attorney James F. Valentine for Apple, Inc. $100.00 fee paid,receipt number 34625003568 (tkm )
January 9, 2008 Filing 16
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Campbell, Dutro)
January 8, 2008 Filing 15
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Smith on behalf of Digital Background Corporation (Smith, Stephen)
January 4, 2008 Filing 13
NOTICE of Appearance by Dutro E. Campbell, II on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Campbell, Dutro)
December 28, 2007 Filing 12
Motion and Order to Appear Pro Hac Vice granting appearance of Attorney Dutro E. Campbell, II for Apple, Inc. $100.00 fee paid,receipt number 34625003273 (tkm )
December 26, 2007 Filing 11
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Conran on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Conran, Joseph)
December 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10
ORDER, Granting 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time up to 1/22/08 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Clifford J. Proud on 12/21/07. (amv)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William D. Stiehl recused. Case reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William D. Stiehl on 12/19/07. (jkb)
December 18, 2007 Filing 8
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Apple, Inc.. (Gutzler, Greg)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge David R Herndon recused. Case reassigned to Judge William D. Stiehl for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David R Herndon on 12/12/07. (pab )
December 4, 2007 Filing 6
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Digital Background Corporation. Apple, Inc. served on 11/30/2007, answer due 12/20/2007. (Lesko, Paul)
November 16, 2007 Filing 5
Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (tkm )
November 14, 2007 Filing 3
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Digital Background Corporation. (Lesko, Paul)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Background Corporation v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Background Corporation
Represented By: Katharine Anne Wark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Digital Background Corporation
Represented By: Stephen C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?