Cabrera v. Bay Area Credit Services
Plaintiff: Joel Cabrera
Defendant: Bay Area Credit Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv03761
Filed: August 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice re 41 Stipulation, 40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS; SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT PAYMENT AND STIPULATED DISMISSAL. The Show Cause Hearing set for 7/13/2009 is VACATED. On or before 7/20/2009, Defendant shall tender the Settlement Payment and attorney fees and costs as awarded by the Court to Plaintiff. The parties shall file a Stipulated Dismissal free of any contingent due by 8/10/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Sanctions. The Court orders both parties to appear for an Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Certification deadline due by 7/7/2009. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 29 Motion for Attorney Fees. On or before June 25, 2009, the parties shall filed a Stipulated Dismissal. Failure to do so may result in appropriate sanctions for both parties. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009) Modified docket text on 6/18/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT; ORDER REFERRING MOTION re 91 Notice of Settlement: Show Cause Response or Stipulated Dismissal due by 5/1/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/11/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon . James Ware. The Court refers Plaintiff's anticipated petition for attorney fees under FDCPA to Magistrate Judge Lloyd for a report and recommendation. The Court reserves for Judge Lloyd the determination of an appropriate briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009) Modified docket text on 3/20/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 7 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/25/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabrera v. Bay Area Credit Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Cabrera
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Credit Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Steinheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?