Briggs v. Evans
Petitioner: Averill W. Briggs
Respondent: Evans
Case Number: 5:2008cv03856
Filed: August 12, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 33 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis as Unnecessary; Denying 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel as Moot. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/29/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 6 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Averill W. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?