Cicala et al v. City of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Paul Cicala, Enrico Sagullo and Erick Sanchez
Defendant: City of San Jose, Robert Davis, Ordaz, Higgins, Marfia, Kyono, Siegel, Joe Doe and Richard Roe individually and in their capacities as Police Officers for the City of San Jose, the identity and number of whom are unknown to plainitff; and Does 1 through 200
Case Number: 5:2008cv04032
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 74 Stipulation Transferring Case to Magistrate Grewal For All Purposes and Unrelating the Valdez Matter (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER CONTINUING MARCH 15, 2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on March 12, 2012. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Grewal for Settlement re (84 in 4:09-cv-00176-CW), (73 in 4:09-cv-02617-CW) (64 in 4:08-cv-04032-CW) Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/5/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER CLARIFYING 34 ORDERS RELATING CLAIMS in Case No. C08-04032 JF; C09-02617 JW (PVT). The Court hereby clarifies that the Cicala and Heiman plaintiffs are free to settle their Monell claims as long as all parties to those actions, including the municipal defendants, stipulate that any settlement will not have any effect on the claims or defenses in the Valdez litigation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on August 17, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011) Modified on 8/17/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re (74 in 5:09-cv-00176-RMW) Further Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/30/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RELATING CLAIMS IN PART WITH CASE #09-cv-2617-JW, DOCKET ENTRY (#34), DATED 03/25/2010. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/25/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re 27 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/10/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RELATING CLAIMS IN PART WITH CASE #09-cv-176-RMW, DOCKET ENTRY #(21), DATED 06/10/2009. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/10/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REQUESTING BRIEFING ON WHETHER THE TWO ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/6/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cicala et al v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Cicala
Represented By: Anthony Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrico Sagullo
Represented By: Anthony Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Sanchez
Represented By: Anthony Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ordaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marfia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Doe and Richard Roe individually and in their capacities as Police Officers for the City of San Jose, the identity and number of whom are unknown to plainitff;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 200
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?