Nicholas v. Department of Corrections
Petitioner: Isaac Nicholas
Respondent: Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and John Marshall
Case Number: 5:2008cv04082
Filed: August 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 14 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/13/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel Granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Dismissal With Leave to Amend by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 4 Motion to Appointment of Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isaac Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?