Avocet Sports Technology, Inc, et al-v-Amer Soirts Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Avocet Sports Technology, Inc. and Vertical Instruments, Inc.
Defendant: Amer Sports Corporation, Suunto U.S.A, Inc and Amer Sports U.S.A.
Case Number: 5:2008cv04264
Filed: September 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/7/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO DISMISS ACTION IN ITS ENTIRETY WITH PREJUDICE re 141 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. ***Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER RE 139 Joint Statement re Mediation. In light of the parties' representation, the Court VACATES all pretrial and trial dates and terminate all pending Motions as withdrawn. On or before April 21, 2011, the parties shall file their Stipu lated Dismissal. If a Stipulated Dismissal is not on file, the parties shall file a Joint Statement updating the Court on the status of their settlement and state how much additional time is required for the parties to finalize their settlement. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/31/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. On or before March 10, 2011, the parties shall file a Joint Statement re: Mediation to inform the Court with respect to their efforts to secure a mediator for the settlement negotiations, the schedule for m ediation, and whether or not a representative with the authority to approve a settlement from Defendants' parent company in Finland will be in attendance during the mediation; On or before March 25, 2011, the parties shall file a Second J oint Statement re: Mediation to update the Court on the parties' mediation efforts, including the results of the mediation process, if any, or if a mediation has yet to be conducted, the schedule for the mediation session. On or before May 6, 20 11, the parties shall submit a Joint Pretrial Conference Statement that includes, inter alia, the results of the mediation, if necessary, and the parties' readiness for trial. The Court sets the following pretrial and trial dates. Pretrial and T rial schedule is set for Courtroom 5, 17th Floor in San Francisco: 1) Final Pretrial Conference set for May 16, 2011 at 11:00 AM, 2) Jury Selection set for May 31, 2011 at 9:00 AM - 12:00 PM, 3) Jury Trial set for May 31, 2011 at 1:00 PM - 4:00 PM; J une 1, 2011 through June 3, 2011 at 9:00 AM - 12:00 PM; 1:00 PM - 4:00 PM; June 7, 2011 through June 10, 2011 at 9:00 AM - 12:00 PM; 1:00 PM - 4:00 PM; June 14, 2011 through June 16, 2011 at 9:00 AM - 12:00 PM; 1:00 PM - 4:00 PM, 4) Argue and Submit June 17, 2011 at 9:00 AM - 12:00 PM; 5) Jury Deliberations June 17, 2011; June 20, 2011 through June 24, 2011. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/7/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AMER SPORTS CORP.'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 89 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - (JURY TRIAL). The 8/30/2010 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered tocomply with the following schedule: Last Date to Hear Dispositive Motion set for 11/29/2010 09:00 AM. All motions must be noticed and filed in accordancewith the Civil Local Rules of Court. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement,In Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions Due 2/4/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2011 11:00 AM, Jury Selection set for 3/8/2011 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 3/8/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further trial specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO DELETE DOCUMENT NO. 57 re 59 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Adjust Expert Disclosure Dates re 55 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 14, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 38 Stipulation filed by Amer Sports Winter & Outdoor Company. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 20, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 36 Stipulation filed by Amer Sports Winter & Outdoor Company. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 12, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER re 29 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Avocet Sports Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 22, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Case Management Conference statement re 25 Stipulation. Deadline to file extended to 1/16/2009. The parties have complied with this deadline and filed their 29 Joint Case Mangement Conference Statement. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 20 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avocet Sports Technology, Inc, et al-v-Amer Soirts Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avocet Sports Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Frear Stephen Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vertical Instruments, Inc.
Represented By: Frear Stephen Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amer Sports Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suunto U.S.A, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amer Sports U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?