Yepez et al v. Jasper Sea Palace, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mario Yepez, Rafael Perez and Alfonso Garcia Rios
Defendant: Jasper Sea Palace, Inc. and Sujuan Li
Case Number: 5:2008cv04411
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/21/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER STRIKING ANSWER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE SCHEDULING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Richard Seebog on 1/13/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE 48 , 57 GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/29/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010).
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE: 46 DENYING REQUEST TO APPROVE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/15/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE: 32 GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs are required to E-FILE the amended document. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE SUJUAN LI (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 2/25/2009 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/15/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yepez et al v. Jasper Sea Palace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Yepez
Represented By: James Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Perez
Represented By: James Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Garcia Rios
Represented By: James Dal Bon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Sea Palace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sujuan Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?