Mosaid Technologies Inc. v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mosaid Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Micron Technology, Inc. and Powerchip Semiconductor Corporation
Counter-claimant: Micron Technology, Inc., Powerchip Semiconductor Corporation and Mosaid Technologies Inc.
Counter-defendant: Mosaid Technologies Inc. and Micron Technology, Inc.
Miscellaneous: Louis Brucculeri
Case Number: 5:2008cv04494
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER RELATING CASE NUMBER CV-09-1838-JF. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/13/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 434 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/3/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 420 Motion to Shorten Time (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 410 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL FOR RELATED CASE CONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on October 2, 2008. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosaid Technologies Inc. v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mosaid Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Robert Scott Wales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Roy Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerchip Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Justin Kurt Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: John C Spaccarotella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Powerchip Semiconductor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Mosaid Technologies Inc.
Represented By: John David Hamann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Mosaid Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Robert Scott Wales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Micron Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Roy Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Louis Brucculeri
Represented By: Louis Brucculeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?