Pedraza et al v. Borg
Plaintiff: Martin Pedraza, Valentin Pedraza and Felipe Salinas
Defendant: Reuben Borg
Case Number: 5:2008cv04710
Filed: October 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 DISMISSING CASE. Case dismissed with prejudice. Court to retain jurisdiction to enforce settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/17/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 62 plaintiffs' request for a settlement conference; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re settlement. Stipulated dismissal due by 5/14/2010. If dismissal not filed by that date, then Show Cause Response due by 5/18/2010 and Show Cause Hearing set for 5/25/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/9/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/11/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re Deadline for Defendants' Consent Form. Consent form to be filed by 7/24/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/14/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER Changing Date of Case Management Conference. Case management conference re-set to 6/30/2009, 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2. Parties' joint case management statement due by 6/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/1/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Further Case Management Conference. Further case management conference set for 5/5/2009, 1:30 PM. Joint case management statement due by 4/28/2009. Plaintiffs' lead counsel to appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/8/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedraza et al v. Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Pedraza
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentin Pedraza
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Salinas
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reuben Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?