Waissman v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Dalit Waissman
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America, SAP American, Inc. Long Term Disability Income Plan and SAP America, Inc. Life Insurance Plan
Case Number: 5:2008cv04731
Filed: October 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER APPROVING 40 STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE TO RESOLVE THE FINAL ISSUES IN THIS ACTION AND REQUEST TO TAKE THE JULY 23, 2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR. The Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 is VACATED. A Motion Hearing is set for 10/15/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER APPROVING 38 STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES RE: CONTINUING THE STATUS CONFERENCE OF JUNE 11, 2010. The Status Conference set for 6/11/2010 is CONTINUED to 7/23/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/9/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS re 34 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/2/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW SIGNED BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL ON 1/20/2010. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: MODIFICATION OF THE SCHEDULING ORDER IN THIS MATTER re 14 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/15/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPROVING 10 STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF THE FEBRUARY 27, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2009 is CONTINUED to 7/10/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/23/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waissman v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalit Waissman
Represented By: Charles Balch Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAP American, Inc. Long Term Disability Income Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAP America, Inc. Life Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?