Andrew Smith Company v. Paul's Pak Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Smith Company
Defendant: Paul's Pak, Inc., Premium Fresh Farms, LLC, PDP & Associates, LLC, AG Harvesting & Technologies, LLC, CV Investments, LLC, ESV Investments, LLC, Salvador Paul Tarantino, Paul S. Tarantino, John L. Simmons, Emmitt L. Pfost, Jack Parson, Steven A. Cinelli, John D. Tamagni, Robert Elliott, James S. Tamagni and Richard Tamagni
Case Number: 5:2008cv04802
Filed: October 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Agriculture Acts Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER 400 After Pre-Trial Conference Allowing Projector and Screen. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/16/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 302 Paul's Pak Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 1 (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting 319 Motion to Strike (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 353 request for entry of judgment (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 358 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding briefing schedule for motion to strike (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 351 STIPULATION AND ORDER 350 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/22/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 349 STIPULATION AND ORDER 348 to Continue Status Conference: Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/27/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 345 STIPULATION AND ORDER 344 to Stay Action and Continue Trial Due to Bankruptcy Filings of Salvador Paul Tarantino and Premium Fresh Farms. Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/1/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER 297 Granting Stipulation to Extend Time Re: Pretrial Preparation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/18/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 220 , 229 , 232 Motions for Summary Judgment on Paul's Pak Claims (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 206 defendant Paul's Pak, Inc.'s Motion to Compel; denying 207 defendant Paul's Pak, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 STIPULATION AND ORDER 292 Moving Hearing Date From October 15, 2010 to October 22, 2010. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/13/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER re 237 Stipulation filed by Andrew Smith Company. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/25/10. (rmwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 190 Motion to Continue Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Date. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Granting 199 Request to Appear Telephonic at 7/23/2010 Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/22/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re 190 MOTION to Continue. Signed by Judge Whyte on 7/9/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 174 Motion to Dismiss Church Brothers, LLC's Counterclaim. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 177 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/28/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 146 Motion to Dismiss and denying 150 Motion for Sanctions. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER 140 to Extend Time for All Parties to Exchange Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/23/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 122 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER EXCUSING PAUL S. TARANTINO FROM PERSONALLY APPEARING AT MEDIATIONSigned by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/15/2009. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER 84 to Continue Case Management Conference: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/20/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER 75 to Take Church Brothers, LLC's and True Leaf Farms, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Off Calendar. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/30/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER 41 to Continue Case Management Conference:Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/26/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew Smith Company v. Paul's Pak Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Smith Company
Represented By: Jan Leslie Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul's Pak, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Fresh Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDP & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Harvesting & Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CV Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESV Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Paul Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S. Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmitt L. Pfost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Parson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Cinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Tamagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Tamagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Tamagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?