Gomelsky v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Giorgio Gomelsky alleged that the Powerbook G4 sold by Defendant Apple Inc. contained a widespread and commonplace characteristic defect and design flaw that rendered its memory slots inoperative.

Plaintiff: Giorgio Gomelsky
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv04969
Filed: October 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract Product Liability Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 91 Renotice motion hearing APPLE INC.S SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 Filing 91 Renotice motion hearing Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint filed byApple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 90 Declaration of Alexei Klestoff in Support of 87 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 87 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 89 Brief re 87 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 87 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 88 Request for Judicial Notice re 87 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 87 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint)(Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re (85 in 5:08-cv-04969-JF), (55 in 5:09-cv-01649-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/15/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 85 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 84 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/05/2010, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2010. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 83 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Class Action Complaint against Apple, Inc.. Filed byGiorgio Gomelsky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull re 76 Motion for Administrative Relief (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re (80 in 5:08-cv-04969-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/6/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 80 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Plaintiffs' Time to File Third Amended Complaint by Reuben Berenblat, Laura Miller, Andrew Personette, Earl Simpson. (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 78 Proposed Order, 77 Memorandum in Opposition (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 78 Proposed Order re 77 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 77 Memorandum in Opposition re 76 MOTION for Administrative Relief filed byApple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 22, 2010 Filing 76 MOTION for Administrative Relief filed by Reuben Berenblat, Giorgio Gomelsky, Laura Miller, Andrew Personette, Earl Simpson, Deborah J. Vail. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 2 Proposed Order)(Pettit, Eric) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART (granting 58 in case 5:08-cv-04969-JF; granting 41 in case 5:09-cv-01649-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/7/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. Berg (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 74 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/5/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/5/2010) re (58 in 5:08-cv-04969-JF) MOTION to Dismiss, (41 in 5:09-cv-01649-JF) MOTION to Dismiss. The motions are taken under submission. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 73 **PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR**Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/5/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 2/5/2010) . (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2010) Modified on 2/11/2010 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2010 Filing 71 Proposed Order re 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006745.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006745.) by Reuben Berenblat, Giorgio Gomelsky, Laura Miller, Andrew Personette, Earl Simpson, Deborah J. Vail. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Filing 70 MOTION for Attorney Michael A. Berg for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006745.) filed by Reuben Berenblat, Giorgio Gomelsky, Laura Miller, Andrew Personette, Earl Simpson, Deborah J. Vail. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Filing 69 NOTICE by Reuben Berenblat et. al of Filing Application For Admission of Attorney Michael A. Berg Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Filing 68 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 69 . *** NOTICE by Reuben Berenblat et al. of Filing of Application for Admission of Attorney Michael A. Berg Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/3/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2010 Filing 67 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 66 Reply Memorandum re 58 MOTION to Dismiss APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byApple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
December 21, 2009 Filing 65 Memorandum in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Dismiss APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byReuben Berenblat, Laura Miller, Andrew Personette, Earl Simpson. (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (63 in 5:08-cv-04969-JF), (46 in 5:09-cv-01649-JF). Case Management Conference continued to 2/5/2010 09:00 AM, to be heard with the motion, in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/12/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 9, 2009 Filing 63 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Requesting Continuance of Case Management Conference by Reuben Berenblat, Laura Miller, Andrew Personette, Earl Simpson. (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 62 Proposed Order re 60 Declaration in Support, 61 Request for Judicial Notice, 58 MOTION to Dismiss APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, 59 Brief, [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLE INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 61 Request for Judicial Notice re 60 Declaration in Support, 58 MOTION to Dismiss APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, 59 Brief, REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 60 , 58 , 59 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 60 Declaration of Alexei Klestoff in Support of 58 MOTION to Dismiss APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, 59 Brief, filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 58 , 59 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 59 Brief re 58 MOTION to Dismiss APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT APPLE INC.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 58 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re (56 in 5:08-cv-04969-JF), (39 in 5:09-cv-01649-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/6/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 56 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 21, 2009 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Apple, Inc.. Filed byAndrew Personette, Reuben Berenblat, Laura Miller, Earl Simpson. (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting (38) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:08-cv-04969-JF; granting (21) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:09-cv-01649-JF (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 14, 2009 Filing 53 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 8/14/2009) re (21 in 5:09-cv-01649-JF) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc., (38 in 5:08-cv-04969-JF) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc. The motions are taken under submission. Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/14/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 8/14/2009). Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2009 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2009)
August 11, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 8/10/09. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
July 31, 2009 Filing 52 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Reuben Berenblat, Laura Miller, Andrew Personette, Earl Simpson. (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 Filing 51 Reply to Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed byApple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 29, 2009 Filing 50 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 8/10/09 at 10:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 23, 2009 Filing 49 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed byReuben Berenblat, Giorgio Gomelsky, Laura Miller, Andrew Personette, Earl Simpson, Deborah J. Vail. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 45 ). The Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2009 is CONTINUED to 8/14/2009 at 9:00 AM immediately following the hearing on the Motion To Dismiss set on that date. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/9/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Eric S. Pettit (Pettit, Eric) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 45 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Andrew Personette, Earl Simpson, Laura Miller, Deborah J. Vail, Giorgio Gomelsky, Reuben Berenblat. (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 44 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 1, 2009 Filing 42 Proposed Order re 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 Filing 41 Request for Judicial Notice re 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 Filing 40 Declaration of Alexei Klestoff in Support of 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 Filing 39 Brief re 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 Filing 37 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 36 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Apple, Inc.. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/20/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 34 Declaration of Eric H. Gibbs in Support of 33 MOTION to Relate Case filed byDeborah J. Vail. (Related document(s) 33 ) (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Deborah J. Vail. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Relating Cases)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christine McAteer Ford (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Christine McAteer Ford ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611005028.) filed by Giorgio Gomelsky. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Apple, Inc.. Filed byGiorgio Gomelsky. (Attachments: # 1 FIRST AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS)(Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER (approving 28 ). The Case Management Conference set for 3/13/09 is CONTINUED to 6/19/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/26/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 28 STIPULATION by Giorgio Gomelsky. (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER (approving docket no. 26 ). The Motion Hearing set on 3/6/09 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/30/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 26 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by Giorgio Gomelsky. (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 25 Renotice motion hearing re Apple Inc.'s Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss and to Strike filed byApple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 22, 2008 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 23 Certificate of Interested Entities (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 17 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 21 Proposed Order re 17 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike by Apple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 20 Declaration of Anne M. Hunter in Support of 17 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 19 Request for Judicial Notice re 17 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 18 Brief re 17 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 12/16/08. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2008: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2008 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2008 10:30 AM Before Honorable Jeremy Fogel. Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2009. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 14 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a U.S. District Judgeby Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/15/2008) Text modified on 12/16/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 8 Application for Admission of Attorney (Carton) Pro Hac Vice. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 6 Application for Admission of Attorney (Noll) Pro Hac Vice. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 6, 2008 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time To Respond To Complaint ( 1 ) by Apple, Inc. (Klestoff, Alexei) (Filed on 11/6/2008) Linkage added on 11/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2008 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Giorgio Gomelsky NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Crowther, Robyn) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 10 (Proposed) Order Granting Application of Admission of Attorney Jeffrey Carton Pro HaC vICE re 8 by Giorgio Gomelsky. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 9 (Proposed) Order Granting Application to for Admission of Attorney Jerome Noll Pro Hac Vice re 6 ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004130.) by Giorgio Gomelsky. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 8 Application for Admission of Attorney Jeffrey I. Carton Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004129) filed by Giorgio Gomelsky. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008) Text modified on 11/5/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2008 Filing 7 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611004128). Filed by Giorgio Gomelsky. (Attachments: # 1 part 2)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008) Text modified on 11/5/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2008 Filing 6 Application for Admission of Attorney Jerome Noll Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004130.) filed by Giorgio Gomelsky. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008) Text modified on 11/5/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2009. Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Trumbull on 10/30/08. (Attachments: # 1 CM Standing Order, # 2 Judge Trumbull's Standing Order, # 3 Standing Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Giorgio Gomelsky (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008) (srm, COURT STAFF).Text modified on 11/5/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 1 *FILED IN ERROR* Please see document number 7 for correct pdf document. COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611004128.). Filed byGiorgio Gomelsky. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008) (srm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/31/2008 (srm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomelsky v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giorgio Gomelsky
Represented By: Albert Quoc Giang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?