Mformation Technologies, Inc. v. Research in Motion Limited et al

Plaintiff: Mformation Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Research in Motion Limited and Research In Motion Corporation
Case Number: 5:2008cv04990
Filed: October 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1165 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PAYMENT OF TAXED COSTS filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 1145 MST's Motion to Join as Co-Plaintiff. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 1148 MST's Motion to Shorten Time. The motion to substitute shall be heard on August 22, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. RIM's opposition shall be filed by August 9, 2013. MST's reply shall be filed no later than noon on August 12, 2013 (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1143 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Protective Order filed by Mformation Software Technologies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 1117 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from the Taxing of Costs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 1084 Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 1085 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 1094 1096 RIM's Motion for Leave to File; Denying 1106 Mformation Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File; Denying as Moot 1093 1105 Motions to File Under Seal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Hon. James Ware no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/20/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 ORDER TERMINATING APPOINTMENT OF TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 27, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1055 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on August 2, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 941 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 31, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION TESTIMONY PLAYED DURING TRIAL re 1031 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 18, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Briefing due by 7/27/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Judge James Ware. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 17, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 10, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 914 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' REQUEST FOR REAL TIME TRANSCRIPT FEED. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on June 11, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ORDER requiring joint production of pretrial materials. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 6, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 14, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 800 THIRD CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 10, 2012. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER granting 759 Stipulation filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited; taking motions under submission; setting time for oral argument. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 8, 2012. (jwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 755 NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/7/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER re: Filing Under Seal re 727 Declaration in Support, filed by Mformation Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/21/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 725 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 719 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 700 Order, [JOINT] Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Date of Ordered Deposition filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/14/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER granting re 613 Declaration in Support filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/6/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING REGARDING CLAIM 1 OF THE '917 PATENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/31/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 576 STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating settlement conference AS AMENDED BY COURT; Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/21/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 389 (1) granting defendants' motion to strike errata sheet; and (2) denying without prejudice defendants' motion for evidentiary sanctions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 541 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 540 Stipulation filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 533 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 522 Stipulation, filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/24/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 497 defendants' Motion to Compel Documents. 6/21/2011 hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER VACATING TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/2/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER re 488 Notice (Other) filed by Mformation Technologies, Inc., Attorney Gina Ann Bibby and Cynthia Jo Franecki terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/4/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 487 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 485 Stipulation, filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Limited. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/2/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 394 defendants' Motion to Redact 386 August 3, 2010 Hearing Transcript. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 450 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,343,408 AND CLAIMS 7, 8 AND 26 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,970,917 PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) re 445 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 378 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST REGARDING TIMING FOR EXPERT REPORTS re 360 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF BRADFORD J. BLACK AS COUNSEL FOR RIM re 223 Notice (Other). Attorney Bradford John Black terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 192 plaintiff's Motion to (1) Compel Depositions and (2) De-Designate Emails. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 161 plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 211 changing hearing dates re parties' discovery motions 161 , 165 and 192 . Motion hearings set for 8/3/2010, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/18/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 198 Replacement of Docket No. 192 and Docket No. 193. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/15/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. On or before 4/16/2010, Plaintiff shall file its revised infringement contentions in light of the Court's First Claim Construction Order. The Court refers the parties to Magistrate Judge Laporte for th e purpose of settlement. On or before 4/19/2010, the parties shall contact Judge Laporte to schedule a settlement conference.Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2010 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2010 09:00 AM, Further Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see the Court's Order for further specifics. ***Motions terminated: 130 MOTION for Leave to File, 133 MOTION to Seal filed, 136 MOTION to Amend/Correct RIM's Invalidity Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,970,917 and U.S. Patent No. 7,343,408 Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-6. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 3/29/2010 re 128 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 4/2/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/5/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 FIRST CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 25, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SUPPLEMENTAL THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION RECORD re 125 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER AMENDING 106 Order on Motion to Seal re 115 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/16/209. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT CONTINUING DATES FOR CLAIM TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARINGS re 80 Stipulation. On 11/19/2009 09:00 AM the Court will conduct a Tutorial on the patents-in-suit. On 11/20/2009, the Court will hol d the Claim Construction hearing. The Claim Construction briefing schedule shall be in accordance with the Local Patent Rules and the Court's Patent Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ADVANCING TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARINGS. Case Tutorial set for 10/14/2009 at 09:00 AM, Claim Construction set for 10/15/2009 at 09:00 AM. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/22/2009. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER VACATING 9/21/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 75 Joint Case Management Statement. Pursuant to the Court's 42 Patent Scheduling Order, the parties shall appear or a Tutorial Hearing set for 10/16/2009 09: 00 AM, and Claim Construction Hearing set for 10/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 4th Floor San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot 56 plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/14/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re 11 Stipulation. Deadline for response due 12/23/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/25/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Modified on 12/1/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mformation Technologies, Inc. v. Research in Motion Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mformation Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Amardeep Lal Thakur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?