Jones v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Raymon Jones
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2008cv05218
Filed: November 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Taxes Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 16 TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER 14 (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: STAND-BY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/5/2009 09:30 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/3/2009. Case Management Conference scheduled for 6/17/09 vacated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/15/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymon Jones
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?