Van et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nathalie Thuy Van
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, INC., John Doe and Rachel Roe
Case Number: 5:2008cv05296
Filed: November 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER Resolving Attorney Claims and Ordering Distribution of Funds Deposited With Court Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67 (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 1/12/2021)<hr><center>Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)</center>
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 640 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 639 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $30,000.00 against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO ALLOW BILL OF COSTS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 614 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 600 SECOND FURTHER INSTRUCTION TO THE JURY Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 13, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 594 AMENDED FINAL VERDICT FORM Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 12, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 592 AMENDED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 10, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 591 FINAL VERDICT FORM Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 9, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 574 AMENDED PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 5, 2015 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 560 NOTICE RE TRIAL SCHEDULE Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 31, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER RE: CHARGE CONFERENCE re 553 , 552 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 18, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 540 (SIGNED COPY) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS, granting 532 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/15/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 495 NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 5, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 465 motion for further consideration of order re bill of costs (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 432 Motion for Bill of Costs; denying 435 Motion for Attorney Fees (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 431 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/2/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2011: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER Vacating Hearing re 377 MOTION to Quash. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 10, 2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 347 Motion for Leave To File Motion To Quash (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER Granting 212 Administrative Motion for Leave To File Motion To Compel. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 25, 2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Denying 224 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal as Exhibits to Defendant's Reply Brief to Motion for Leave for a Mental Health Examination. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 10, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011) Modified on 3/10/2011 (psglc2, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER Relieving Parties of Meet and Confer Requirement and Instead Requiring Parties to Obtain Leave of Court Before Filing Any Further Discovery or Sanctions Motions. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/7/11. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal Granting-in-Part and Denying-in-Part 101 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Taking Motions Under Submission. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/29/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Continuing to January 4, 2010 the Hearings on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, Plaintiffs Motion for Contempt, Defendants Motion for Protective Order, Defendants Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/20/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CORRECTED ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/22/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/21/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re 51 Granting Plaintiff Nathalie Van's Motion to Amend the First Amended Complaint and Setting a Deadline for Defendant to File a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/24/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER to Defendant to File Revised Opposition Papers that Do Not Disclose Confidential Settlement Negotiations; and ORDER Continuing All Hearings to July 20, 2010. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 6/21/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 INTERIM ORDER re 45 Plaintiff Nathalie Van's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/24/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Extending Stay of Case to July 20, 2010, and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/20/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 27 Tentatively Granting Plaintiffs' Counsel's Motion to Withdraw, Continuing Hearing on Motion, and Scheduling Briefing. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/6/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 Regarding Mediation. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/29/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/16/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 Granting Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/15/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 2 Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/10/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathalie Thuy Van
Represented By: Anthony Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?