WCH, Inc. et al v. Wyle
Plaintiff: Marilyn Morgan and USBC Manager-San Jose
Appellant: WCH, Inc.
Appellee: Frederick S. Wyle
Case Number: 5:2008cv05331
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Bankruptcy Appeal (801) Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Whyte on 4/6/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/27/2009. Signed by Judge Whyte on 03/17/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/13/2009. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/27/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WCH, Inc. et al v. Wyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WCH, Inc.
Represented By: Orrin Leigh Grover, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Frederick S. Wyle
Represented By: Barry Milgrom, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USBC Manager-San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?