Chatman v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Chatman
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2008cv05535
Filed: December 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 21, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOUND AS MOOT for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment re 29 Stipulation. Plaintiff has filed her response prior to the stipulated deadline. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER as Moot re 25 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MOOT re 21 Stipulation. The Stipulation is found as MOOT. The Motion for Summary Judgment has been filed as stipulated by the parties, see 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/5/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment re 19 Stipulation. Deadline to file Motion due by 10/5/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 7 Motion to Set Aside. Plaintiff SHALL file an Amended Complaint by 2/20/09(jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009) Modified on 2/10/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED and that the clerk issue summons. It is further ordered that the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, any amendments, scheduling orders, attachments, plaintiff's affidavit and this order upon the defendant. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Chatman
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?