Kava v San Jose Mercury News, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bradley Kava
Defendant: San Jose Mercury News, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv05556
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:185 Employee Pension Plan

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 Continuing Motion to Remand and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/27/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Reassign the Case to a District Judge and Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/18/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 *** FILED IN ERROR IN WRONG CASE. PLEASE IGNORE. *** ORDER Scheduling Briefing on Reasonableness of Special Master Denver's Fees. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/13/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/13/2009) Modified on 2/13/2009 (pvtlc1).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kava v San Jose Mercury News, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose Mercury News, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Kava
Represented By: John A. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?