Mondragon et al v. Fernandez
Plaintiff: Florencia Aramburo Mondragon and Luis Alberto Zavala Fraga
Defendant: Jesus Fernandez
Case Number: 5:2008cv05722
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 9/30/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S RULE 50(B) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER 63 to Consolidate Matters for Trial and to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order. Jury Selection set for 9/12/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/13/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER 58 to Reset Discovery and Trial Date in Both Matters: Jury Selection set for 6/20/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Fl oor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Discovery cutoff 5/2/2011. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/7/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER 56 to Reset Discovery and Trial Date in Both Matters: Jury Trial set for 4/11/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/22/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Victoria L.H. Booke for Jesus Fernandez. Attorney Robert David Baker terminated (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING 43 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and VACATING hearing on 05/25/2010 by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING re 18 Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery filed by Florencia Aramburo Mondragon, Luis Alberto Zavala Fraga. Hearing continued to 3/9/2010. See order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/26/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 24 ; Stipulation to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Order. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 12/28/2009. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Re: Relation of Cases. The Parties are to file any objection within 10 days of the date of this order. If no objection is filed within 10 days the cases will be related and action number C08-5722 JW will be reassigned to Judge Ronald Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009) Modified on 7/17/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 5/4/2009 TO 5/18/2009. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 5/8/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware . Should the parties fail to adhere to the terms of this Order, this case shall be subject to dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mondragon et al v. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florencia Aramburo Mondragon
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Zavala Fraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?