Illinois Computer Research, LLC v. Fish & Richardson P.C. Featured Case

Cisco Systems Inc. and Richard Frenkel moved to quash the subpoena that compelled Frenkel, a non-party witness, to testify and produce documents.

Plaintiff: Illinois Computer Research, LLC
Defendant: Fish & Richardson P.C.
3rd Party Defendant: Scott C. Harris
3rd Party Plaintiff: Fish & Richardson P.C.
Movant: Cisco Systems Inc. and Richard Frenkel
Case Number: 5:2008mc80075
Filed: April 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (1) vacating May 13, 2008 motion hearing; and (2) terminating all pending motions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
May 7, 2008 Filing 43
Declaration of HOWARD HOLDERNESS in Support of 41 Notice (Other), 42 Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF HOWARD HOLDERNESS IN SUPPORT OF RICHARD FRENKEL'S AND CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICES OF WITHDRAWAL OF ALL PENDING MOTIONS AND EXHIBIT A filed byRichard Frenkel. (Related document(s) 41 , 42 ) (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Paul K. Vickrey. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 29, 2008 Filing 37
Declaration of CHARLES L. BABCOCK in Support of 35 Reply to Response to Motion, CHARLES L. BABCOCK'S SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byRichard Frenkel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Related document(s) 35 ) (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
April 28, 2008 Filing 23
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C. Harris (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 4/28/2008)
April 24, 2008 Filing 22
NOTICE by Richard Frenkel Richard Frenkel's Notice of Intent to Use Evidence From Related Case, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Submit Declaration of Richard Frenkel Filed on April 21, 2008 in N.D.CAL. Case No. 5:08-MC-80074-JF-HRL (Docket No. 16) (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 4/24/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 21
Memorandum in Opposition to Frenkel's and Cisco's 1 and 4 Motions to Quash ICR's Subpoena for Documents and Testimony filed byIllinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C. Harris. (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 4/22/2008) Modified on 4/23/2008 (gm, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17
ORDER (1) denying Illinois Research Computer/Harris motion for order shortening time re motion to compel; and (2) re-setting hearings on Frenkel's and Cisco's motions to quash and for protective order. Motion hearings set for 5/13/2008, 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2. Briefing to proceed in accordance with the court's Civil Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/17/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2008)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Charles L. Babcock IV. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 14
NOTICE by Cisco Systems Inc. AMENDED NOTICE OF RICHARD FRENKEL'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CISCO SYSTEM INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (Holderness, Howard) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Computer Research, LLC v. Fish & Richardson P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Computer Research, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fish & Richardson P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Scott C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Fish & Richardson P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Cisco Systems Inc.
Represented By: Howard Holderness, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Richard Frenkel
Represented By: Howard Holderness, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?