Hall v. Tehrani et al
Plaintiff: Richard Gary Hall, Jr.
Defendant: Jasmine A. Tehrani and James P. Murphy
Case Number: 5:2009cv00057
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 224 Motion for Court Copies. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Denying 212 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Granting 214 Motion for the Court Verify Disposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; Granting 217 Motion for the Court Order Plaintiff's Motion Does Not Conflict with Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/29/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 203 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Ronald M. Whyte 145 Motion ; 148 Motion ; 150 Motion ; 152 Motion ; 154 Motion ; 156 Motion ; 166 Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Opposition. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/29/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying in Part 106 , 109 Motion to Compel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Addressing Pending Motions by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Directing Deendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/4/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Vacating Order of Partial Dismissal and Scheduling Order; Granting 75 Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER of Partial Dismissal; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion; Addressing Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/29/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER 72 Staying Discovery. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 40 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Denying 35 Motion to Compel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion; Denying 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File as Moot. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 16 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Filing Fee. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Filing Fee. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of Partial Dismissal; Order of Servie; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/6/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Tehrani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gary Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine A. Tehrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?