Tietsworth v. Sears, Roebuck and Co. et al
Plaintiff: Renee Tietsworth
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co. and Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv00288
Filed: January 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DENYING 179 PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/28/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 123 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. Plaintiffs' request to compel production of documents granted in part and denied in part. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 INTERIM ORDER re 123 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. No later than 1/4/2013, documents to be lodged for in camera review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/17/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 137 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY; DENYING 129 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY; AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 126 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (Also granting 163 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/4/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE (approving 134). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/13/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE (approving 124 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/16/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re 120 Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/10/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION 106 TO AMEND THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on July 29, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re 105 . Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 11/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/14/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 69 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 67 MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PUBLIC FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' UNREDACTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 66 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/16/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 59 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/24/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 51 ). The Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2009 is RESET for 12/4/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/22/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 32 MOTION TO DISMISS. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 46 ). The Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2009 is CONTINUED to 10/30/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/16/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/11/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 6 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tietsworth v. Sears, Roebuck and Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Tietsworth
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Represented By: James M. Hanlon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: James M. Hanlon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?