Heat Surge. LLC et al v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Heat Surge, LLC and World Reserve Monetary Exchange, Inc
Defendant: Bob Lee and Kelly J Walker
Case Number: 5:2009cv00572
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Suggesting Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/10/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/27/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 48 Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/10/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 45 , 46 ). The Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2011 is CONTINUED to 8/26/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/10/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER APPROVING 43 STIPULATION TO VACATE AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2010 is CONTINUED to 3/11/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/3/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING 41 STIPULATION TO VACATE AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2010 is CONTINUED to 9/10/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/10/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER APPROVING 38 STIPULATION TO VACATE AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2009 is CONTINUED to 3/12/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/8/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Selecting ADR Process, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/29/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 14 Motion to Dismiss and Staying Action Pending Resolution of State Court Proceedings (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON 14 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/19/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heat Surge. LLC et al v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heat Surge, LLC
Represented By: Leo Patrick Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Reserve Monetary Exchange, Inc
Represented By: Leo Patrick Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly J Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?