September 2, 2015 |
Filing
356
ORDER RE FURTHER MATERIALS FROM CLASS MEMBERS SUSAN AND ROBERT TERRY; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLASS COUNSEL ; AND INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/2/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
351
ORDER RE CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLASS MEMBER AND INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
|
December 16, 2013 |
Filing
341
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 308 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
|
December 12, 2013 |
Filing
338
Notice of Tentative Ruling and Questions for Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
|
November 25, 2013 |
Filing
328
ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 25, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing
297
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Provisionally Certifying Settlement Class, Appointing Class Representatives and Class Counsel, and Setting Deadlines and Final Fairness Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/27/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
|
August 26, 2013 |
Filing
295
ORDER GRANTING 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Trex Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
|
August 19, 2013 |
Filing
292
ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 258 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing
278
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 277 STIPULATION re 258 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement,. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
|
May 28, 2013 |
Filing
276
ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/28/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing
270
ORDER GRANTING 269 STIPULATION Extending Due-Date for Replies to Objectors' Oppositions to Motion for Preliminary Approval, Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, and Appointment of Class Representatives and Class Counsel. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
|
March 18, 2013 |
Filing
256
ORDER GRANTING 255 STIPULATION regarding Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Page Limit. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/18/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
|
March 4, 2013 |
Filing
254
ORDER GRANTING 234 AND 236 Motions to Enforce Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 4, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
243
AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE(correction of time for Case Management Conference): Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing
233
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 232 STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing
231
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 230 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing
229
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 228 STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
|
April 24, 2012 |
Filing
227
ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 226 Joint Motion to Continue April 27, 2012 Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 24, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing
221
ORDER Granting 220 Stipulation Regarding Schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware for Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 18, 2012. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing
216
ORDER GRANTING 215 Stipulation Requesting Revision of Schedule as it Pertains to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Motions due by 1/20/2012. Replies due by 3/5/2012. Responses due by 2/20/2012. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/13/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
|
October 12, 2011 |
Filing
193
ORDER GRANTING 192 Stipulation Requesting Revision of Schedule as it Pertains to Plaintifs' Motion for Class Certification: Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2012. Motion for Class Certification due by 1/6/2012. Opposition due by 2/6/201 2. Reply due by 2/21/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 3/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
189
STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER re 187 . Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 1/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/14/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
|
March 10, 2011 |
Filing
188
Protective ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 10, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
|
November 23, 2010 |
Filing
174
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: LEADERSHIP re 169 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/16/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing
172
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT (granting 163 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
|
April 7, 2010 |
Filing
154
FINAL ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND DISMISSING RELEASED CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/7/2010, Nunc Pro Tunc to 3/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
|
March 16, 2010 |
Filing
152
ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF SURFACE FLAKING CLAIMS IN ROSS ACTION; APPROVING STIPULATED AMENDMENT TO REASSERT MOLD CLAIMS IN ROSS ACTION; CONSOLIDATING ROSS AND OKANO ACTIONS; AND APPOINTING LEAD COUNSEL IN CONSOLIDATED ACTION (addressing 88 , 89 , 133 and 134 in Ross Action; addressing 69 in Okano Action). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing
142
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO RECEIVE ECF NOTIFICATIONS re 140 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/29/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
|
October 28, 2009 |
Filing
120
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME (approving 106 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/22/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
|
July 9, 2009 |
Filing
75
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN REASSIGNED CASE (approving 72 ). A Case Management Conference is set for 7/10/2009 at 9:00 AM following the hearing on the Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/8/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
|
May 26, 2009 |
Filing
30
RELATED CASE ORDER re 19 MOTION to Relate Case, Finding as MOOT 20 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 6/26/2009, Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor,San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Motions terminated: 19 MOTION to Relate Case. Related cases: Create association to 3:09-cv-01878-WHA. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
|