Dannenberg v. Ayers et al
Plaintiff: John E. Dannenberg
Defendant: Robert L. Ayers, Jr, R. K. Wong, Arnold Schwarzenegger, John Monday, Martin Hoshino and James Davis
Case Number: 5:2009cv00832
Filed: February 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER RE: 89 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/23/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 89 TO CONTINUE MOTION TO DISMISS. AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/16/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE: 25 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/10/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010).
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER CONTINUING 11/18/09 HEARING AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING RE: 25 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/9/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ** CORRECTED ORDER SETTING CONSENT/DECLINATION DEADLINE. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 3 EX PARTE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dannenberg v. Ayers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Dannenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Ayers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. K. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Monday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hoshino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?