Martinez et al v. Antique & Salvage Liquidators, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edwin Martinez, Roger Lindolfo, Wilmer Ruiz, Gabriel Franco, Oscar Rodriguez, Carlos Avila, Gustavo Mejia and Amado Martinez
Defendant: Antique & Salvage Liquidators, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv00997
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER RE 92 STIPULATION for Approval of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/26/11. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 84 stipulation to waive jury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/8/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING 52 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/7/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER (1) MODIFYING 70 February 8, 2011 order granting in part and denying in part Defendants' motion for summary judgment and (2) DENYING AS MOOT 74 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/25/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO CHRIS OLIVERIO RE: HIS FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION. On or before March 1, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., Oliverio shall either (1) appear for his deposition at a date, time, and place agreed to between himself and Plaintiffs counsel or (2) appear in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, United States District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, CA 95113 and show cause, if any, why he should not be held in contempt under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 for his failure to obey t he subpoena.Plaintiffs shall personally serve Oliverio with a copy of this order by February 14, 2011. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/1/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/8/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 46 . The hearing on Defendants' motion shall take place on 2/1/2011 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/20/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/8/2010.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2010. Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/11/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 Stipulation for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/12/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 Stipulation, filed by Gabriel Franco, Edwin Martinez, Oscar Rodriguez, Gustavo Mejia, Roger Lindolfo, Carlos Avila, Wilmer Ruiz, Amado Martinez. Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry within 3 days of this order. Fact Discovery Cutoff extended to July 31, 2010. Remaining scheduling dates are vacated; further Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/11/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation, filed by Gabriel Franco, Edwin Martinez, Oscar Rodriguez, Gustavo Mejia, Roger Lindolfo, Carlos Avila, Wilmer Ruiz, Amado Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/14/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Antique & Salvage Liquidators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Martinez
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Lindolfo
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmer Ruiz
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Franco
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Rodriguez
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Avila
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Mejia
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amado Martinez
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antique & Salvage Liquidators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?