Bush v. Flores
Plaintiff: James Alan Bush
Defendant: Flores
Case Number: 5:2009cv01024
Filed: March 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 4/8/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 4/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference on February 25, 2011, at San Jose, California.Signed by Judge Vadas on 2/16/11. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for settlement conference in San Francisco on February 25, 2011.Signed by Judge Vadas on 1/27/11. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER VACATING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for James Bush to be produced at 1/31/11 Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/21/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Amended WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport plaintiff to settlement conference in San Francisco on January 31, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/12/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued for transport of Plaintiff inmate to Courtroom D on the 15th floor of the U.S. District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102, on January 31, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on January 10, 2011. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2011: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service) (njvlc2, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/16/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Alan Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?