Diaz v. Mann Bracken, LLP
Plaintiff: Noemi Diaz
Defendant: Mann Bracken, LLP
Case Number: 5:2009cv01761
Filed: April 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/2/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE: 27 GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 05/10/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES re 17 Joint Case Management Statement; Finding as Moot 13 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. The Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Mann Bracken, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noemi Diaz
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mann Bracken, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?