EU3C USA, Inc. v. American Musical Supply, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: EU3C USA, Inc.
Defendant: American Musical Supply, Inc. and Retail Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 5:2009cv01789
Filed: April 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 40 Stipulation filed by EU3C USA, Inc. The Clerk shall close this file.. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 28, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend ADR Deadline re 36 Stipulation. Deadline to Complete Mediation by 7/29/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 21 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 11/30/2009 re 20 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 11/30/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009) Modified text on 11/17/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EU3C USA, Inc. v. American Musical Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EU3C USA, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick E. Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Musical Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retail Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?