JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Roberts
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Cynthia Roberts
Case Number: 5:2009cv01855
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Continuing Hearing and Setting Deadline for Parties to File Either a "Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," or Else a "Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment." Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/16/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re Plaintiff's Current Pro Se Status. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/1/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INTERIM ORDER re (11 in 5:09-cv-01879-PVT) Soliciting Further Briefing from Defendant Chase; and ORDER Continuing Hearing. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/13/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Motion to Extend Stay. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/22/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference; and ORDER Directing Cynthia Roberts to Comply with this Court's Prior Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/23/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 . Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/28/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 7 Relating and Consolidating this Case with Case No. C 09-1879 HRL. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 6/10/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Show Cause Why this Case Should Not Be Related to and Consolidated with Case No. C 09-1879 HRL. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/7/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Roberts
Represented By: Timothy Douglas Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?