Mou v. West Valley College et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Chin-Li Mou
Defendant: West Valley College, John Hendrickson, Philip L. Hartley, Ernest Smith, Laura Lorman, Chris Rolen and Linbero #107
Case Number: 5:2009cv01910
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE re 66 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/22/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 21, 2010 Filing 66 STIPULATION Stipulated Order Dismissing Action with Prejudice by West Valley College. (Shupe, John) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/20/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 21, 2009 Filing 64 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 12/21/2009). (not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER APPROVING 61 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2009 is CONTINUED to 2/12/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/17/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: 60 ASSIGNING CASE TO ASSISTED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 10, 2009 Filing 61 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference and Order by West Valley College. (Shupe, John) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 10, 2009 Filing 60 Declaration in Support of Application for Assignment to the Assisted Settlement Conference Program by Chin-Li Mou. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 3, 2009 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled 11/3/09 has been rescheduled to 11/5/09 at 8:00 a.m. Please take note that the ADR Office will initiate the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 59 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/3/09 at 3:30 p.m. Please take note that the ADR Office initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 58 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Settlement Conference set for 12/21/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/27/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 57 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/9/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 10/9/2009), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Seeborg for Settlement Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 46 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) Modified on 10/5/2009 (jflc1, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2009 Filing 55 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by West Valley College. (Shupe, John) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 46 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/30/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 21, 2009 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chin-Li Mou re 52 Reply to Opposition (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 18, 2009 Filing 52 Reply to Opposition re 46 MOTION Relief from Judgment-Fraud and Misconduct re 40 Order filed byChin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 51 Memorandum in Opposition (Document 50) Proof of Service (Overnighting to Ptf) filed byWest Valley College. (Shupe, John) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 50 Memorandum in Opposition re 46 MOTION Relief from Judgment-Fraud and Misconduct re 40 Order filed byWest Valley College. (Shupe, John) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Application for Exemption from Electronic Public Access Fees. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on August 17, 2009. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chin-Li Mou re 46 MOTION Relief from Judgment-Fraud and Misconduct re 40 Order, 47 Notice of Hearing on Motion (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 11, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Judgment by Chin-Li Mou Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 4, 2009 Filing 46 MOTION for Relief from Judgment-Fraud and Misconduct re 40 Order filed by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 28, 2009 HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/30/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2009)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re Letter Received July 21, 2009 and Granting Request for ECF Access. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on July 24, 2009. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Order Re Service: POS showing overnight service to plaintiff of defs' answer to amended complaint, opposition to motion for preliminary injunction; TOC with exhibits in support of opposition by West Valley College. (Shupe, John) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE Service. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on July 16, 2009. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
June 30, 2009 Filing 41 Received Document by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING 4 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/29/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 26, 2009 Filing 39 Minute Entry: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 6/26/2009 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/26/2009). The matter is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2009)
June 24, 2009 Filing 38 EXHIBITS re 37 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byWest Valley College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 37 ) (Shupe, John) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 24, 2009 Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byWest Valley College. (Shupe, John) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 16, 2009 Filing 36 Answer to Amended Complaint by Hendrickson, Hartley, Smith, Fishbaugh, Lorman, Aimonetti, Prochaska, Rolen, Lindberg (Linbero #710) and byWest Valley College. (Shupe, John) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ernest Smith served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed Laura Lorman served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed Fred Prochaska served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed Dave Fishbaugh served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cathy Aimonetti served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed West Valley College served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed Linbero #107 served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed Chris Rolen served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed Philip L. Hartley served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed John Hendrickson served on 6/3/2009, answer due 6/23/2009. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 25 AMENDED MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 Amended Complaint filed byChin-Li Mou. (Related document(s) 4 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 28, 2009 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chin-Li Mou re 23 Memorandum in Support (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Motion. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on May 28, 2009. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 Amended Complaint filed byChin-Li Mou. (Related document(s) 4 ) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Fred Prochaska. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Cathy Aimonetti. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Dave Fishbaugh. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Linbero #107. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Chris Rolen. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Laura Lorman. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Ernest Smith. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Philip L. Hartley. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to John Hendrickson. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to West Valley College. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 21, 2009 Filing 11 Received addresses of defendants from plaintiff. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 15, 2009 Clerk mailed letter to plaintiff requesting mailing addresses for all defendants so that civil summons can be issued and served pursuant to Order Granting Informa pauperis re ( 10 ) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Chin-Li Mou. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 4 Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on May 7, 2009. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
May 4, 2009 Filing 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/02/2009. Case Management Conference set for 10/09/2009 10:30 AM. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 4, 2009 Filing 5 Proposed Order granting temporary retraining order without notice to adverse party - Setting date of hearing of application for preliminary injunction by Chin-Li Mou. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 4, 2009 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byChin-Li Mou. (Attachments: # 1 part 2)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 2 Proposed Order re: TRO by Chin-Li Mou. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTION RELIEF against West Valley College, John Hendrickson, Philip L. Hartley, Ernest Smith, Laura Lorman, Chris Rolen, Linbero #107. Filed byChin-Li Mou. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009) Modified on 6/26/2009 (sp, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mou v. West Valley College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chin-Li Mou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Valley College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip L. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Lorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Rolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linbero #107
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?