"In re MagSafe Apple Power Adapter Litigation." Featured Case
Plaintiff: Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr, Timothy J Broad and Jesse Reisman
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv01911
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT EXTENDING CASE SCHEDULE DEADLINES re 63 Stipulation; Finding as Moot 61 Stipulation ***Deadlines terminated re 46 SCHEDULING ORDER. Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Deadline to file Class Certification Motion due by 1/10/2011. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Close of All Discovery due by 4/22/2011. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 3/25/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified text on 8/25/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2010 Filing 63 STIPULATION re 61 Stipulation Corrected and [Proposed] Order For Extension of the Case Schedule by Timothy J Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr, Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman, Maxx Scholten. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 62 ERRATA re 61 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order For Extension of the Case Schedule by Timothy J Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr, Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman, Maxx Scholten. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 61 STIPULATION to Extend Class Certification Schedule by Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Helen I. Zeldes)(Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REVISED STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 59 Stipulation. ***Set/Reset Flags: PRVADR. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 59 REVISED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS by Apple, Inc. (Hunter, Anne) (Filed on 6/11/2010) Modified text to conform to item posted on 6/14/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2010 Filing 58 Letter from Ellen Graunke dated 5/10/10. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 56 Stipulation. Deadline to hold ADR session by 6/30/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 9, 2010 Filing 56 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND REVISED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 54 Stipulation filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on February 12, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 54 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] REVISED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Apple, Inc.. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE STIPULATION AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 52 Stipulation filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on February 11, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 10, 2010 Filing 52 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order by Apple, Inc.. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 51 Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint byApple, Inc.. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc.. Filed byNaotaka Kitagawa, Jr. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/19/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 13, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 1/12/10. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 3/1/10 at 1:30 p.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 6, 2010 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 1/12/2010 at 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled to 3:30 p.m. on 1/12/2010. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
December 17, 2009 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. (Hunter, Anne) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 17, 2009 Filing 47 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Hunter, Anne) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2009 is VACATED. The parties are ordered to comply with the following scheduling order: Close of All Discovery due by 12/6/2010. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2011. Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for 10/4/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 10/29/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2010 11:00 AM M in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 45 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT , Joint 26(f) Report and Proposed Order filed by Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 4, 2009 Filing 44 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc.. Filed by Timothy J Broad, Jesse Reisman, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr, Tracey Hackwith, Michael Martin. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 12/4/2009) Modified on 12/7/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Complaint due by 12/7/2009. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2009. Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL by Judge James Ware granting (38) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (39) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 5:09-cv-01911-JW (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
October 20, 2009 Filing 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 41 Proposed Order re 39 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 40 Declaration of Helen I. Zeldes in Support of 39 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byNaotaka Kitagawa, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 39 ) (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and [Proposed] Order by Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/19/2009) Modified on 10/26/2009,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING FOR MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND TO APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. The Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2009 is VACATED. The Court will conduct a hearing on the anticipated motion for consolidation and any motion for the appointment of interim class counsel. The parties shall notice and brief their motions pursuant to the applicable Civil Local Rules. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 10/15/09. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for Tuesday, January 12, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 13, 2009 Filing 36 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/15/09 at 1:30 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy J Broad re 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options, 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 32 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 35 . *** NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/9/2009) Modified on 10/13/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2009 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr re 29 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 29 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr re 27 Joint Case Management Statement (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RELATED CASE ORDER. Motions terminated: (18 in 5:09-cv-01911-JW) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/24/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RELATING CASES; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court ORDERS that the following cases are related within the meaning of Civil Local Rule 3-12(a): Kitagawa v. Apple Inc. Case No. C 09-01911 JW, Hackwith v. Apple Inc. Case No. C 09-03862 RMW. Related cases: Create association to 5:09-cv-03862-RMW. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 10/9/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/24/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 18, 2009 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 18, 2009 Filing 21 STIPULATION Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order by Apple, Inc.. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 19 Proposed Order Granting Administrative 18 Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Apple, Inc.. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 9/4/2009) Modified on 9/8/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2009 Filing 18 Motion to Consider Whether Case C09-3862 RMW Should be Related to C09-1911 JW filed by Apple, Inc.. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 9/4/2009) Modified on 9/8/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 15 Notice of Appearance, 16 Notice of Appearance (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew David Muhlbach (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexei Klestoff (Klestoff, Alexei) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint byApple, Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 07/06/09. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re ( 7 ) Declination to Proceed before Magistrage Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified on 7/2/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2009 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Apple, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified on 7/2/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint re ( 5 ) by Apple, Inc. (Moser, Heather) (Filed on 5/22/2009) Linkage added on 5/22/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2009 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed by Jesse Reisman, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr, Timothy J Broad. (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 5/21/2009) Modified on 5/21/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2009 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to Apple, Inc. on 5/4/2009 re 3 ADR Scheduling Order, 2 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, on by Jesse Reisman, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr, Timothy J Broad (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 1, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2009. Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2009 02:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009) (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009) (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2009 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611005165). Filed by Jesse Reisman, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr, Timothy J Broad. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2009: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/7/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: "In re MagSafe Apple Power Adapter Litigation."
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr
Represented By: Helen I. Zeldes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J Broad
Represented By: Helen I. Zeldes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Reisman
Represented By: Helen I. Zeldes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?