Bentajado et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Donato T. Bentajado and Azucena E. Bentajado
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., First American Loanstar Trustee Services and First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2009cv01966
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Donato T. Bentajado, Azucena E. Bentajado. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 17, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 3 Motion for TRO. Plaintiffs SHALL serve Defendants a copy of this Order, the Summons and Complaint, and their Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 5/15/09, Opposition filed by 5/20/09, Plaintiff's Reply filed by 5/24/09. The Parties SHALL appear for a Preliminary Injunction hearing set on 6/8/09 at 9:00am. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009) Modified on 5/21/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/8/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentajado et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donato T. Bentajado
Represented By: Ronald Veridiano Uy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azucena E. Bentajado
Represented By: Ronald Veridiano Uy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Loanstar Trustee Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?