Villanueva et al v. Green Environment Landscape Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Silvestre Villanueva, Roberto Tupull and Hector Giovanni
Defendant: Green Environment Landscape Inc. and Francisco Cortes
Case Number: 5:2009cv02018
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER 28 for Dismissal, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/21/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 8/24/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER 22 to Continue Deadline to Conduct Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/16/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER 20 to Continue Fact Discovery Cutoff Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/21/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER 18 to Continue Deadline to Complete Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/20/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER 14 to Continue Deadline to Conduct Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/2/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER 7 Selecting ADR Process, Case Referred to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villanueva et al v. Green Environment Landscape Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvestre Villanueva
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Tupull
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Giovanni
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Environment Landscape Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?