Bronner v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Cedric J. Bronner
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2009cv02070
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Remand re 28 Stipulation. All pending motions are denied as MOOT. *** Motions terminated: 19 MOTION to Remand. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Filing of Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment re 26 Stipulation. Cross Motions due by 5/14/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTTO FILE CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 24 Stipulation. Motion due 4/14/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to file Response to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment re 22 Stipulation. Deadline to file is 3/15/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FILE DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION re 20 Stipulation. Cross Motion to be filed on or before 2/12/2010.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TIME FOR FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 16 Stipulation. Deadline for Plaintiff to file Motion for Summary Judgment by 12/14/2009. Briefing shall occur as stipulated by the parties. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/13/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bronner v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric J. Bronner
Represented By: Naomi Anna Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?