Botello v. Morgan Hill Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Zuleima Botello
Defendant: Morgan Hill Unified School District, Allan Nishino, Bonnie Tagnazzini, Principal Barbara Kakosane, Glenn Webb, Rex Coffman, Alex Aasen, Wilbert White, Leonard Webb, Judy Kenney, Richard Nathanson, Tammy Keck, Don Moody, Bart Fisher, Shelle Thomas, Mike Hickey, Kathleen Sullivan, Peter Mandel, Julia Hover-Smoot and Maria Canales
Case Number: 5:2009cv02121
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING #51 Plaintiff's Application for Approval of Minor's Compromise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/6/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 53 Stipulation and (Proposed)Order Requesting Approval of Minor's Compromise by Zuleima Botello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 52 Stipulation of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Zuleima Botello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 51 Application for Court Approval of Minor's Compromise; Declaration of Counsel filed by Zuleima Botello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 50 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 2/17/2011 by Mediator, Dana Curtis; Mediation session held on 4/15/2010; Case settled. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 49 Minute Entry: Interim Pretrial Conference. Parties report that a settlement has been reached. (Date Filed: 1/26/2011). (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. Jury trial scheduled for February 2, 2011 is VACATED per the parties' representation that the case has settled. See #49 . (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 17, 2010 Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT the pretrial conference, currently set for January 4, 2011, and jury trial, currently set for January 10, 2011, are continued to Wednesday, January 26, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. and Wednesday, February 2, 2011 at 9:00 a.m., respectively, in Courtroom 2, United States District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #46 Stipulation, filed by Leonard Webb, Barbara Kakosane, Rex Coffman, Morgan Hill Unified School District, Richard Nathanson, Judy Kenney, Wilbert White, Bonnie Tagnazzini, Maria Canales, Tammy Keck, Glenn Webb, Alex Aasen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/13/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 46 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Oreder Deeming ansewer of defendants to be the Answer of Bonnie Tognazzini by Alex Aasen, Maria Canales, Rex Coffman, Barbara Kakosane, Tammy Keck, Judy Kenney, Morgan Hill Unified School District, Richard Nathanson, Bonnie Tagnazzini, Glenn Webb, Leonard Webb, Wilbert White. re #31 Amended Notice of Removal, (Davis, Mark) (Filed on 5/13/2010) Modified on 5/13/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2010 Filing 45 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 4/15/2010 by Mediator Dana L. Curtis; mediation session held 4/15/2010; Case did not settle; Further facilitated discussions are expected by the week of 5/17/2010.(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
March 17, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 4/15/2010 at 09:30 AM at 1960 The Alameda, Suite 210, San Jose, CA. Written statements due by 4/8/2010. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 44 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bonnie Tagnazzini (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER (1) DISMISSING DEFENDANT NISHINO AND (2) SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE: Discovery due by 8/30/2010. Expert Designations and Reports due by 9/15/2010. Designation of Rebuttal Experts and Reports due by 10/1/2010. Expert discovery due by 10/15/2010. Motions due by 11/30/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2011 08:15 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/18/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 42 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/18/2010 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 2/18/2010). (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 41 Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Report . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1), #2 Exhibit B - Supplemental Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure)(Davis, Mark) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Text modified on 2/16/2010 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2010 Filing 40 AMENDED (corrected address) ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Dana Curtis as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 9, 2010 Filing 39 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Dana Curtis as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER (1) DISMISSING UNSERVED DEFENDANTS, (2) REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION, AND (3) SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendants Don Moody, Bart Fisher, Shelle Thomas, Mike Hickey, Kathleen Sullivan, Peter Mandel, and Julia Hover-Smoot dismissed without prejudice. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2010 at 1:30 p.m. See order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/26/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 37 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maria Canales (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/26/2010 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 1/26/2010). Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2010 01:30 PM. (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 35 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Zuleima Botello. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Falcocchia, John) (Filed on 1/20/2010) Text modified on 1/21/2010 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2010 Filing 34 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and for Damages re ( #31 ); Jury Demand by Alex Aasen, Rex Coffman, Tammy Keck, Judy Kenney, Morgan Hill Unified School District, Richard Nathanson, Glenn Webb, Leonard Webb, Wilbert White, Maria Canales, Barbara Nakasone. (Davis, Mark) (Filed on 1/19/2010) Text modified on 1/20/2010 linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case management conference set for 01/26/2010 at 1:30 p.m. Updated joint case management conference statement due 1/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/23/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Alex Aasen, Rex Coffman, Barbara Kakosane, Tammy Keck, Judy Kenney, Morgan Hill Unified School District, Richard Nathanson, Glenn Webb, Leonard Webb, Wilbert White. (Davis, Mark) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 22, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by DB on 12/22/09. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 3/9/2010 at 10:30 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 17, 2009 Filing 31 First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and for Damages; jury demand; against Leonard Webb, Julia Hover-Smoot, Glenn Webb, Shelle Thomas, Mike Hickey, Richard Nathanson, Bart Fisher, Barbara Nakosane, Morgan Hill Unified School District, Alex Aasen, Judy Kenney, Tammy Keck, Peter Mandel, Don Moody, Rex Coffman, Allan Nishino, Wilbert White, Kathleen Sullivan, and Bonnie Tagnazzini, filed by Zuleima Botello, a minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem, (Falcocchia, John) (Filed on 12/17/2009) Text modified on 12/18/2009 conforming to posted document caption incorrect even type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/18/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/18/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2009 Filing 30 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 12/22/09 at 11:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #28 Stipulation filed by Zuleima Botello. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/30/2009. Plaintiff's first amended complaint due 12/17/2009.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 28 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order Extending Time to File Amended Complaint by Zuleima Botello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #12 Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2009 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 11/17/2009) re #12 . (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2009)
November 3, 2009 Filing 25 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Defendant's 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss re ( #12 ) filed by Alex Aasen, Rex Coffman, Tammy Keck, Judy Kenney, Morgan Hill Unified School District, Barbara Nakosane, Richard Nathanson, Glenn Webb, Leonard Webb, Wilbert White. (Tamel, Matthew) (Filed on 11/3/2009) Linkage added on 11/4/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/18/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2009 Filing 24 Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Strike re ( #12 ) filed by Zuleima Botello. (Falcocchia, John) (Filed on 10/29/2009) Modified on 10/29/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2009 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion Hearing for #12 set for 11/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Leonard Webb, Rex Coffman, Morgan Hill Unified School District, Richard Nathanson, Judy Kenney, Wilbert White, Barbara Nakosane, Tammy Keck, Glenn Webb, Alex Aasen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/13/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009) Modified on 12/18/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney and (Proposed) Order by Mark E. Davis (Davis, Mark) (Filed on 10/12/2009) Modified on 10/13/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Conference continued to December 1, 2009 in Courtroom 2, 5th floor of the United States District Court, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/16/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 15, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 15, 2009 Filing 18 ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 15, 2009 Filing 17 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Zuleima Botello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 16 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #14 Received Stipulation and (Proposed) Order filed by Zuleima Botello. Motion hearing re #12 continued to October 27, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/9/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009) Modified on 9/10/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2009 Filing 14 Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Dismiss and Strike re #12 by Zuleima Botello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 12, 2009 Filing 13 (Proposed) Order Granting MOTION to Dismiss & Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) & Rule 12(f) re #12 by Alex Aasen, Rex Coffman, Tammy Keck, Judy Kenney, Morgan Hill Unified School District, Barbara Nakosane, Richard Nathanson, Glenn Webb, Leonard Webb, Wilbert White. (Davis, Mark) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/12/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/18/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2009 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss & Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) & Rule 12(f) re ( #1 ): and Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Alex Aasen, Rex Coffman, Tammy Keck, Judy Kenney, Morgan Hill Unified School District, Barbara Nakosane, Richard Nathanson, Glenn Webb, Leonard Webb, Wilbert White. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Davis, Mark) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Text modified on 8/12/2009 linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/18/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting #3 Motion for appointment of guardian ad litem (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE re #9 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zuleima Botello (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 17, 2009 Filing 9 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zuleima Botello (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 8 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Morgan Hill Unified School District.. (Davis, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Morgan Hill Unified School District. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2009. Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2009 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zuleima Botello re #4 (Proposed) Order, #3 MOTION Petition/ Declaration and Consent for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 4 (Proposed) Order Granting MOTION Petition/ Declaration and Consent for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem re ( #3 ) by Zuleima Botello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 3 Petition/Declaration and Consent for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed by Zuleima Botello. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint, by Zuleima Botello (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Injunctive Relief and Damages (Summons Issued); jury demand; against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611005258). Filed by Zuleima Botello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 14, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Botello v. Morgan Hill Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuleima Botello
Represented By: John Joseph Falcocchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Hill Unified School District
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Nishino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Tagnazzini
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Barbara Kakosane
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Webb
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Coffman
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Aasen
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbert White
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Webb
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Kenney
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Nathanson
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Keck
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelle Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Hover-Smoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Canales
Represented By: Mark E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?