Soto v. Vojtech et al
Plaintiff: Javier Medrano Soto
Defendant: John W Vojtech and CBC Framing, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv02126
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/5/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/17/22. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/28/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010).
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 10 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/10. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: 5 EXTENDING SUMMONS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Vojtech et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Medrano Soto
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Vojtech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBC Framing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?